Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 712 Today
» 862 Yesterday
» 4260 Week
» 5150 Month
» 313131 Year
» 1197512 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 279 m/e 12/1914
LNER (1923 Int) 279C   15/09/1923
LNER (1924) 5279   05/09/1925
LNER (1946 1st) 1340   Not applied
LNER (1946 2nd) 1358   25/08/1946
BR 61358   Not applied

Names Carried
Date From Name
12/1914 EARL KITCHENER OF KHARTOUM

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B8
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B812/1914
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Steam brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 12/1914
Withdrawal Fri 13/08/1948 off Sheffield Darnall (SHF)
Scrapping During 09/1949 at Carriage Works (Dukinfield)
Service Life 33 yrs, 8 mths , 14 dys

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 14/8/48 but cut up at Dukinfield

Allocations
Code Name From Date
ANN Annesley 03/02/1922
LEI Leicester (G.C.) 19/07/1924
ANN Annesley 06/10/1924
GOR Gorton 08/06/1925
CLK Colwick 31/03/1926
ANN Annesley 08/11/1926
CLK Colwick 06/03/1928
ANN Annesley 09/10/1933
SHF Sheffield Darnall 27/04/1947
   Withdrawn 13/08/1948

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC SHF Sheffield Darnall 27/04/1947
WDN SHF Sheffield Darnall 13/08/1948

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1914 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 630)
11/08/1923 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 401)
01/03/1930 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 242)
08/10/1932 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 499)
29/09/1934 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 295)
15/08/1936 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 77)
27/08/1938 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 45)
09/11/1940 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3002)
08/08/1942 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3040)
19/08/1944 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3043)
06/07/1946 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3038)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 25/09/1920 20/10/1920 26 days General  
Gorton Works 23/06/1923 11/08/1923 50 days General
Boiler number 401 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 13/06/1925 05/09/1925 85 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5279
 
Gorton Works 03/12/1927 18/02/1928 78 days General  
Gorton Works 01/02/1930 01/03/1930 29 days General
Boiler number 242 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 03/09/1932 08/10/1932 36 days General
Boiler number 499 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 25/08/1934 29/09/1934 36 days General
Boiler number 295 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 25/07/1936 15/08/1936 22 days General
Boiler number 77 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 30/07/1938 27/08/1938 29 days General
Boiler number 45 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 05/10/1940 09/11/1940 36 days General
Boiler number 3002 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 03/07/1942 08/08/1942 37 days General
New cylinders fitted
Boiler number 3040 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 29/07/1944 19/08/1944 22 days General
Boiler number 3043 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 18/05/1946 06/07/1946 50 days General
Boiler number 3038 (Diagram 13)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1914 To Service To service as GCR Number 279, name: EARL KITCHENER OF KHARTOUM
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 13 boiler fitted
   
25/09/1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/09/1920. Dep: 20/10/1920.    
03/02/1922 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
23/06/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1923. Dep: 11/08/1923.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 401 (Diagram 13)
   
15/09/1923 Renumbered Renumbered to 279C    
19/07/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (LEI)    
06/10/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
08/06/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
13/06/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1925. Dep: 05/09/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5279
   
31/03/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
08/11/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
03/12/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/12/1927. Dep: 18/02/1928.    
06/03/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
01/02/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/02/1930. Dep: 01/03/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 242 (Diagram 13)
   
03/09/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/09/1932. Dep: 08/10/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 499 (Diagram 13)
   
09/10/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
25/08/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/08/1934. Dep: 29/09/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 295 (Diagram 13)
   
25/07/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/07/1936. Dep: 15/08/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 77 (Diagram 13)
   
30/07/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1938. Dep: 27/08/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 45 (Diagram 13)
   
05/10/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1940. Dep: 09/11/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3002 (Diagram 13)
   
03/07/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1942. Dep: 08/08/1942.
Work undertaken:
New cylinders fitted
Boiler number 3040 (Diagram 13)
   
29/07/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/07/1944. Dep: 19/08/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3043 (Diagram 13)
   
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 1340 but not taken up    
18/05/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1946. Dep: 06/07/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3038 (Diagram 13)
   
25/08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1358    
27/04/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 61358 but not taken up    
13/08/1948 Withdrawn Condemned as 1358 from Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
09/1949 Scrapped Broken up by Carriage Works: Dukinfield    

prev prev