|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 25/09/1920 | 20/10/1920 | 26 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 23/06/1923 | 11/08/1923 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 401 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/06/1925 | 05/09/1925 | 85 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5279 |
||
Gorton Works | 03/12/1927 | 18/02/1928 | 78 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 01/02/1930 | 01/03/1930 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 242 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/09/1932 | 08/10/1932 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 499 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/08/1934 | 29/09/1934 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 295 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/07/1936 | 15/08/1936 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 77 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/07/1938 | 27/08/1938 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 45 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/10/1940 | 09/11/1940 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 3002 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/07/1942 | 08/08/1942 | 37 days | General | New cylinders fitted Boiler number 3040 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/07/1944 | 19/08/1944 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3043 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/05/1946 | 06/07/1946 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 3038 (Diagram 13) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
06/04/1946 | Market Harborough | On 6/4/46 the three parts of the 12 noon ex St. Pancras were hauled by 5279 (14B); 5259 (10C); and 5715 (12A), respectively. In the up direction, the 2.40 p.m. ex Leicester was behind 4808 (5A), whilst of the two portions of the 4.50 p.m. ex Leicester (nominally a 19G duty) were worked by 5105 (26A), and 4815 (17A). | SLS/194605 |
30/03/1946 | Crewe/Horwich - Class 5 builds | Further class 5 4-6-0 will be built during 1946 a follows: 4932-66/82-96 or Horwich, 4967-81 at Crewe. | SLS/194605 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1914 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 279, name: EARL KITCHENER OF KHARTOUM Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Diagram 13 boiler fitted |
||
25/09/1920 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/09/1920. Dep: 20/10/1920. | ||
03/02/1922 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
23/06/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1923. Dep: 11/08/1923. Work undertaken: Boiler number 401 (Diagram 13) |
||
15/09/1923 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 279C | ||
19/07/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (LEI) | ||
06/10/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
08/06/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
13/06/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1925. Dep: 05/09/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5279 |
||
31/03/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
08/11/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
03/12/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/12/1927. Dep: 18/02/1928. | ||
06/03/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
01/02/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/02/1930. Dep: 01/03/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 242 (Diagram 13) |
||
03/09/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/09/1932. Dep: 08/10/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 499 (Diagram 13) |
||
09/10/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
25/08/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/08/1934. Dep: 29/09/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 295 (Diagram 13) |
||
25/07/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/07/1936. Dep: 15/08/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 77 (Diagram 13) |
||
30/07/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1938. Dep: 27/08/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 45 (Diagram 13) |
||
05/10/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1940. Dep: 09/11/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3002 (Diagram 13) |
||
03/07/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1942. Dep: 08/08/1942. Work undertaken: New cylinders fitted Boiler number 3040 (Diagram 13) |
||
29/07/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/07/1944. Dep: 19/08/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3043 (Diagram 13) |
||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 1340 but not taken up | ||
18/05/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1946. Dep: 06/07/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3038 (Diagram 13) |
||
25/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1358 | ||
27/04/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
1948 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 61358 but not taken up | ||
13/08/1948 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 1358 from Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
09/1949 | Scrapped | Broken up by Carriage Works: Dukinfield |