Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 139 Today
» 1011 Yesterday
» 139 Week
» 17475 Month
» 295271 Year
» 1179652 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 280 m/e 01/1915
LNER (1924) 5280   19/07/1924
LNER (1946 1st) 1341   Not applied
LNER (1946 2nd) 1359   24/11/1946

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B8
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B801/1915
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Steam brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 01/1915
Withdrawal Tue 25/03/1947 off Annesley (ANN)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 32 yrs, 2 mths , 22 dys

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 29/3/47

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton 17/12/1922
MAR March 04/10/1924
GOR Gorton 21/05/1926
CLK Colwick 10/06/1926
ANN Annesley 31/03/1927
CLK Colwick 02/04/1928
WFD Woodford Halse 08/06/1928
MAR March 13/07/1928
ANN Annesley 17/11/1928
   Withdrawn 25/03/1947

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN ANN Annesley 25/03/1947

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1915 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 631)
25/02/1922 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 309)
19/07/1924 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1546)
12/03/1927 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 626)
29/08/1931 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 309)
10/02/1934 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 388)
25/01/1936 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 274)
06/05/1939 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 763)
30/08/1941 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 781)
07/08/1943 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3028)
23/06/1945 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3007)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 07/01/1922 25/02/1922 50 days General
Boiler number 309 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 17/05/1924 19/07/1924 64 days General
Boiler number 1546 (Diagram 13)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5280
 
Gorton Works 31/12/1926 12/03/1927 72 days General
Boiler number 626 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 10/08/1929 21/09/1929 43 days General  
Gorton Works 18/07/1931 29/08/1931 43 days General
Boiler number 309 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 20/01/1934 10/02/1934 22 days General
Boiler number 388 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 28/12/1935 25/01/1936 29 days General
Boiler number 274 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 13/03/1937 17/04/1937 36 days General  
Gorton Works 08/04/1939 06/05/1939 29 days General
Boiler number 763 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 04/08/1941 30/08/1941 27 days General
Boiler number 781 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 03/07/1943 07/08/1943 36 days General
New cylinders fitted
Boiler number 3028 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 19/05/1945 23/06/1945 36 days General
Boiler number 3007 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 26/10/1946 26/10/1946 1 day Light Repair
Firehole ring fracture
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1915 To Service To service as GCR Number 280
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 13 boiler fitted
   
07/01/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/01/1922. Dep: 25/02/1922.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 309 (Diagram 13)
   
17/12/1922 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
17/05/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/05/1924. Dep: 19/07/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1546 (Diagram 13)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5280
   
04/10/1924 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
21/05/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
10/06/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
31/12/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/12/1926. Dep: 12/03/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 626 (Diagram 13)
   
31/03/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
02/04/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
08/06/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
13/07/1928 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
17/11/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
10/08/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1929. Dep: 21/09/1929.    
18/07/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/07/1931. Dep: 29/08/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 309 (Diagram 13)
   
20/01/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/01/1934. Dep: 10/02/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 388 (Diagram 13)
   
28/12/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/12/1935. Dep: 25/01/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 274 (Diagram 13)
   
13/03/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1937. Dep: 17/04/1937.    
08/04/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/04/1939. Dep: 06/05/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 763 (Diagram 13)
   
04/08/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1941. Dep: 30/08/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 781 (Diagram 13)
   
03/07/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1943. Dep: 07/08/1943.
Work undertaken:
New cylinders fitted
Boiler number 3028 (Diagram 13)
   
19/05/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/05/1945. Dep: 23/06/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3007 (Diagram 13)
   
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 1341 but not taken up    
26/10/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/10/1946. Dep: 26/10/1946.
Work undertaken:
Firehole ring fracture
   
24/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1359    
25/03/1947 Withdrawn Condemned as 1359 from Annesley (ANN)    

prev