|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 19/08/1911 | 07/10/1911 | 50 days | General | New right hand cylinder fitted Boiler number 1224 (Diagram GC9) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/04/1920 | 05/06/1920 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 1207 (Diagram GC9) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/02/1922 | 29/04/1922 | 71 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 05/01/1924 | 29/03/1924 | 85 days | General | Boiler number 1212 (Diagram GC9) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/09/1925 | 23/01/1926 | 120 days | General | Superheated boiler fitted Boiler number 646 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/03/1928 | 21/04/1928 | 50 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 21/06/1930 | 26/07/1930 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 24/09/1932 | 08/10/1932 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 899 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/10/1933 | 18/11/1933 | 29 days | Light Repair | After collision |
||
Gorton Works | 30/03/1935 | 20/04/1935 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 601 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/06/1937 | 26/06/1937 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 899 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/11/1939 | 02/12/1939 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 875 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/07/1942 | 22/08/1942 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 896 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/12/1943 | 29/01/1944 | 33 days | Heavy | New cylinders fitted |
||
Gorton Works | 02/12/1944 | 09/12/1944 | 8 days | Light Repair | After collision |
||
Gorton Works | 09/03/1946 | 30/03/1946 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 838 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/08/1946 | 31/08/1946 | 8 days | Light Repair | After collision |
||
Gorton Works | 22/02/1947 | 15/03/1947 | 22 days | Light Repair |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/1906 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 1106 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4807 Diagram GC9 boiler fitted |
||
19/08/1911 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/08/1911. Dep: 07/10/1911. Work undertaken: New right hand cylinder fitted Boiler number 1224 (Diagram GC9) |
||
17/04/1920 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/04/1920. Dep: 05/06/1920. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1207 (Diagram GC9) |
||
19/08/1921 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
18/02/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1922. Dep: 29/04/1922. | ||
05/01/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/01/1924. Dep: 29/03/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1212 (Diagram GC9) |
||
03/05/1924 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 6106 | ||
26/09/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/09/1925. Dep: 23/01/1926. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted Boiler number 646 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
07/06/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD) | ||
03/03/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/03/1928. Dep: 21/04/1928. | ||
08/08/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
27/08/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD) | ||
04/06/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
21/06/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/06/1930. Dep: 26/07/1930. | ||
09/09/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD) | ||
29/08/1932 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
24/09/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/09/1932. Dep: 08/10/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 899 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
27/10/1932 | Allocation | Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD) | ||
11/10/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
21/10/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/10/1933. Dep: 18/11/1933. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
30/03/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/03/1935. Dep: 20/04/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 601 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
17/06/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD) | ||
19/01/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
12/06/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1937. Dep: 26/06/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 899 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
13/10/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD) | ||
27/09/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
04/11/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/11/1939. Dep: 02/12/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 875 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
06/04/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD) | ||
21/09/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
31/07/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/07/1942. Dep: 22/08/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 896 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
28/12/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 28/12/1943. Dep: 29/01/1944. Work undertaken: New cylinders fitted |
||
02/12/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/12/1944. Dep: 09/12/1944. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
11/03/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Brunswick (LIV) | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 1343 but not taken up | ||
09/03/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/03/1946. Dep: 30/03/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 838 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
24/08/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/08/1946. Dep: 31/08/1946. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
16/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1470 | ||
22/02/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/02/1947. Dep: 15/03/1947. | ||
1948 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 61470 but not taken up | ||
19/11/1948 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 1470 from Brunswick (LIV) |