Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 131 Today
» 988 Yesterday
» 4262 Week
» 14432 Month
» 292228 Year
» 1176609 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1107 m/e 09/1906
LNER (1923 Int) 1107C   24/11/1923
LNER (1924) 6107   26/09/1925
LNER (1946 1st) 1344   Not applied
LNER (1946 2nd) 1471   17/11/1946

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B9
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B909/1906
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 4808
Brakes (when built) Steam brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 09/1906
Withdrawal Thu 20/11/1947 off Heaton Mersey (STP)
Scrapping Carriage Works (Dukinfield)
Service Life 41 yrs, 2 mths , 20 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
LIN Lincoln 19/05/1922
GOR Gorton 20/04/1925
TFD Trafford Park (LNER) 18/03/1930
GOR Gorton 09/09/1930
TFD Trafford Park (LNER) 06/01/1932
GOR Gorton 14/07/1933
TFD Trafford Park (LNER) 19/06/1936
GOR Gorton 13/10/1937
TFD Trafford Park (LNER) 06/04/1941
GOR Gorton 21/09/1941
19D Heaton Mersey 08/11/1941
   Withdrawn 20/11/1947

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN STP Heaton Mersey 20/11/1947

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1906 Diagram GC9 boiler fitted (number 1217)
05/10/1912 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1219)
30/08/1919 Diagram GC9 boiler fitted (number 1212)
10/11/1923 Diagram GC9 boiler fitted (number 117)
12/01/1929 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1696)
14/03/1931 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1777)
16/09/1933 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 407)
12/10/1935 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 725)
20/11/1937 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1920)
27/04/1940 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 850)
13/03/1943 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 899)
07/07/1945 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 723)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 07/0745   General  
Gorton Works 05/05/1909 03/07/1909 60 days General
New right hand cylinder ftted
 
Gorton Works 13/07/1912 05/10/1912 85 days General
Boiler number 1219 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 13/04/1918 30/08/1919 505 days General
Awaiting new boiler
Boiler number 1212 (Diagram GC9)
 
Gorton Works 01/10/1921 21/01/1922 113 days General  
Gorton Works 29/09/1923 10/11/1923 43 days General
Boiler number 117 (Diagram GC9)
 
Gorton Works 11/07/1925 26/09/1925 78 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6107
 
Gorton Works 23/07/1927 24/09/1927 64 days General  
Gorton Works 03/11/1928 12/01/1929 71 days General
Superheated boiler fitted
Boiler number 1696 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 14/02/1931 14/03/1931 29 days General
Boiler number 1777 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 12/08/1933 16/09/1933 36 days General
Boiler number 407 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 28/09/1935 12/10/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 725 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 30/10/1937 20/11/1937 22 days General
Boiler number 1920 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 30/03/1940 27/04/1940 29 days General
New right hand cylinder fitted
Boiler number 850 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 17/02/1943 13/03/1943 25 days General
Boiler number 899 (Diagram 17Sup)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/0745 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Dep: ?/07/0745.    
09/1906 To Service To service as GCR Number 1107
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4808
Diagram GC9 boiler fitted
   
05/05/1909 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/05/1909. Dep: 03/07/1909.
Work undertaken:
New right hand cylinder ftted
   
13/07/1912 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/07/1912. Dep: 05/10/1912.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1219 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
13/04/1918 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/04/1918. Dep: 30/08/1919.
Work undertaken:
Awaiting new boiler
Boiler number 1212 (Diagram GC9)
   
01/10/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1921. Dep: 21/01/1922.    
19/05/1922 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN)    
29/09/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1923. Dep: 10/11/1923.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 117 (Diagram GC9)
   
24/11/1923 Renumbered Renumbered to 1107C    
20/04/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
11/07/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1925. Dep: 26/09/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6107
   
23/07/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/07/1927. Dep: 24/09/1927.    
03/11/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1928. Dep: 12/01/1929.
Work undertaken:
Superheated boiler fitted
Boiler number 1696 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
18/03/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD)    
09/09/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
14/02/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/02/1931. Dep: 14/03/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1777 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
06/01/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD)    
14/07/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
12/08/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1933. Dep: 16/09/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 407 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
28/09/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1935. Dep: 12/10/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 725 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
19/06/1936 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD)    
13/10/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
30/10/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/10/1937. Dep: 20/11/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1920 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
30/03/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/03/1940. Dep: 27/04/1940.
Work undertaken:
New right hand cylinder fitted
Boiler number 850 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
06/04/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD)    
21/09/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
08/11/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (19D)    
17/02/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/02/1943. Dep: 13/03/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 899 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
07/07/1945 Modification Diagram 17Sup number 723 boiler fitted    
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 1344 but not taken up    
17/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1471    
20/11/1947 Withdrawn Condemned as 1471 from Heaton Mersey (19D)    

prev prev