|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 23/03/1912 | 15/06/1912 | 85 days | General | Boiler number 1216 (Diagram GC9) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/03/1918 | 26/10/1918 | 211 days | General | Boiler number 1223 (Diagram GC9) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/02/1921 | 02/04/1921 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 30/12/1922 | 12/05/1923 | 134 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 05/07/1924 | 15/11/1924 | 134 days | General | Superheated boiler & new 21in type 8K p.v. cylinders fitted Boiler number 591 (Diagram 17Sup) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6109 |
||
Gorton Works | 18/12/1926 | 20/02/1927 | 65 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 19/03/1927 | 09/04/1927 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 29/12/1928 | 16/02/1929 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 913 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/08/1930 | 11/10/1930 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 09/04/1932 | 23/04/1932 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 650 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/06/1934 | 14/07/1934 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 849 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/04/1936 | 09/05/1936 | 15 days | General | Narrow ring piston valves fitted Boiler number 897 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/08/1938 | 17/09/1938 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 468 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/05/1941 | 31/05/1941 | 29 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 09/08/1943 | 21/08/1943 | 13 days | General | Boiler number 841 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/01/1946 | 02/02/1946 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 333 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/01/1947 | 01/02/1947 | 8 days | Light Repair | Loose cylinders |
||
Gorton Works | 31/12/1947 | 31/12/1947 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/1906 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 1109 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4810 Diagram GC9 boiler fitted |
||
23/03/1912 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/03/1912. Dep: 15/06/1912. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1216 (Diagram GC9) |
||
30/03/1918 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/03/1918. Dep: 26/10/1918. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1223 (Diagram GC9) |
||
19/02/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/02/1921. Dep: 02/04/1921. | ||
19/08/1921 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
30/12/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/12/1922. Dep: 12/05/1923. | ||
05/07/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/07/1924. Dep: 15/11/1924. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler & new 21in type 8K p.v. cylinders fitted Boiler number 591 (Diagram 17Sup) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6109 |
||
18/12/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/12/1926. Dep: 20/02/1927. | ||
19/03/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/03/1927. Dep: 09/04/1927. | ||
29/12/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/12/1928. Dep: 16/02/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 913 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
15/04/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD) | ||
25/10/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
30/08/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/08/1930. Dep: 11/10/1930. | ||
09/04/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/04/1932. Dep: 23/04/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 650 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
11/07/1932 | Allocation | Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD) | ||
23/03/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
23/06/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1934. Dep: 14/07/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 849 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
25/04/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1936. Dep: 09/05/1936. Work undertaken: Narrow ring piston valves fitted Boiler number 897 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
20/08/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1938. Dep: 17/09/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 468 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
03/05/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1941. Dep: 31/05/1941. | ||
21/06/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD) | ||
09/08/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/08/1943. Dep: 21/08/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 841 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 1346 but not taken up | ||
05/01/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/01/1946. Dep: 02/02/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 333 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
27/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1473 | ||
25/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/01/1947. Dep: 01/02/1947. Work undertaken: Loose cylinders |
||
31/12/1947 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 1473 from Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD) | ||
31/12/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 31/12/1947. Dep: 31/12/1947. |