Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 873 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 4733 Week
» 7315 Month
» 271948 Year
» 1493513 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1109 m/e 09/1906
LNER (1924) 6109   15/11/1924
LNER (1946 1st) 1346   Not applied
LNER (1946 2nd) 1473   27/10/1946

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B9
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B909/1906
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 4810
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 09/1906
Withdrawal Wed 31/12/1947 off Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD)
Scrapping Carriage Works (Dukinfield)
Service Life 41 yrs , 4 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1906
GOR Gorton 19/08/1921
TFD Trafford Park (LNER) 15/04/1929
GOR Gorton 25/10/1929
TFD Trafford Park (LNER) 11/07/1932
GOR Gorton 23/03/1934
TFD Trafford Park (LNER) 21/06/1941
   Withdrawn 31/12/1947

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN TFD Trafford Park (LNER) 31/12/1947

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1906 Diagram GC9 boiler fitted (number 1219)
15/06/1912 Diagram GC9 boiler fitted (number 1216)
26/10/1918 Diagram GC9 boiler fitted (number 1223)
15/11/1924 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 591)
16/02/1929 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 913)
23/04/1932 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 650)
14/07/1934 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 849)
09/05/1936 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 897)
17/09/1938 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 468)
21/08/1943 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 841)
02/02/1946 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 333)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 23/03/1912 15/06/1912 85 days General
Boiler number 1216 (Diagram GC9)
 
Gorton Works 30/03/1918 26/10/1918 211 days General
Boiler number 1223 (Diagram GC9)
 
Gorton Works 19/02/1921 02/04/1921 43 days General  
Gorton Works 30/12/1922 12/05/1923 134 days General  
Gorton Works 05/07/1924 15/11/1924 134 days General
Superheated boiler & new 21in type 8K p.v. cylinders fitted
Boiler number 591 (Diagram 17Sup)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6109
 
Gorton Works 18/12/1926 20/02/1927 65 days General  
Gorton Works 19/03/1927 09/04/1927 22 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 29/12/1928 16/02/1929 50 days General
Boiler number 913 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 30/08/1930 11/10/1930 43 days General  
Gorton Works 09/04/1932 23/04/1932 15 days General
Boiler number 650 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 23/06/1934 14/07/1934 22 days General
Boiler number 849 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 25/04/1936 09/05/1936 15 days General
Narrow ring piston valves fitted
Boiler number 897 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 20/08/1938 17/09/1938 29 days General
Boiler number 468 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 03/05/1941 31/05/1941 29 days General  
Gorton Works 09/08/1943 21/08/1943 13 days General
Boiler number 841 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 05/01/1946 02/02/1946 29 days General
Boiler number 333 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 25/01/1947 01/02/1947 8 days Light Repair
Loose cylinders
 
Gorton Works 31/12/1947 31/12/1947 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1906 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 1109
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4810
Diagram GC9 boiler fitted
   
23/03/1912 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/03/1912. Dep: 15/06/1912.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1216 (Diagram GC9)
   
30/03/1918 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/03/1918. Dep: 26/10/1918.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1223 (Diagram GC9)
   
19/02/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/02/1921. Dep: 02/04/1921.    
19/08/1921 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
30/12/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/12/1922. Dep: 12/05/1923.    
05/07/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/07/1924. Dep: 15/11/1924.
Work undertaken:
Superheated boiler & new 21in type 8K p.v. cylinders fitted
Boiler number 591 (Diagram 17Sup)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6109
   
18/12/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/12/1926. Dep: 20/02/1927.    
19/03/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/03/1927. Dep: 09/04/1927.    
29/12/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/12/1928. Dep: 16/02/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 913 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
15/04/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD)    
25/10/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
30/08/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/08/1930. Dep: 11/10/1930.    
09/04/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/04/1932. Dep: 23/04/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 650 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
11/07/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD)    
23/03/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
23/06/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1934. Dep: 14/07/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 849 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
25/04/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1936. Dep: 09/05/1936.
Work undertaken:
Narrow ring piston valves fitted
Boiler number 897 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
20/08/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1938. Dep: 17/09/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 468 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
03/05/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1941. Dep: 31/05/1941.    
21/06/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD)    
09/08/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/08/1943. Dep: 21/08/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 841 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 1346 but not taken up    
05/01/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/01/1946. Dep: 02/02/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 333 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
27/10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1473    
25/01/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/01/1947. Dep: 01/02/1947.
Work undertaken:
Loose cylinders
   
31/12/1947 Withdrawn Condemned as 1473 from Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD)    
31/12/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 31/12/1947. Dep: 31/12/1947.    

prev prev