|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 17/12/1910 | 28/01/1911 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 1222 (Diagram GC9) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/09/1915 | 16/10/1915 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1220 (Diagram GC9) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/05/1921 | 24/09/1921 | 141 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 29/03/1924 | 18/10/1924 | 204 days | General | Superheated boiler fitted Boiler number 553 (Diagram 17Sup) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6111 |
||
Gorton Works | 30/04/1927 | 25/06/1927 | 57 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 17/08/1929 | 05/10/1929 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 641 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/06/1932 | 18/06/1932 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 913 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/08/1934 | 25/08/1934 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 830 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/09/1936 | 03/10/1936 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 901 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/01/1938 | 29/01/1938 | 22 days | Light Repair | After collision |
||
Gorton Works | 07/10/1939 | 21/10/1939 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 837 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/12/1942 | 19/12/1942 | 18 days | General | Boiler number 3738 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/11/1944 | 11/11/1944 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 18/01/1947 | 29/03/1947 | 71 days | General | New cylinders fitted Boiler number 896 (Diagram 17Sup) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1906 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 1111 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4812 Diagram GC9 boiler fitted |
||
17/12/1910 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/12/1910. Dep: 28/01/1911. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1222 (Diagram GC9) |
||
25/09/1915 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/09/1915. Dep: 16/10/1915. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1220 (Diagram GC9) |
||
10/1916 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) | ||
07/05/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1921. Dep: 24/09/1921. | ||
29/03/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1924. Dep: 18/10/1924. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted Boiler number 553 (Diagram 17Sup) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6111 |
||
12/11/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
30/04/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/04/1927. Dep: 25/06/1927. | ||
28/11/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD) | ||
13/08/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
17/08/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1929. Dep: 05/10/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 641 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
25/10/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD) | ||
30/04/1932 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
04/06/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1932. Dep: 18/06/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 913 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
11/08/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1934. Dep: 25/08/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 830 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
02/02/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD) | ||
19/06/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
19/09/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/09/1936. Dep: 03/10/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 901 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
08/01/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/01/1938. Dep: 29/01/1938. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
05/08/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD) | ||
30/09/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
11/09/1939 | Reinstated | Reinstated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
07/10/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/10/1939. Dep: 21/10/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 837 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
07/12/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (19D) | ||
08/11/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
02/12/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1942. Dep: 19/12/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3738 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
09/05/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Brunswick (LIV) | ||
18/07/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (19D) | ||
04/11/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/11/1944. Dep: 11/11/1944. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 1348 but not taken up | ||
27/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1475 | ||
18/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1947. Dep: 29/03/1947. Work undertaken: New cylinders fitted Boiler number 896 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
12/02/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 61475 | ||
16/05/1949 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61475 from Heaton Mersey (19D) | ||
07/1949 | Scrapped | Broken up by Carriage Works: Dukinfield |