Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 220 Today
» 1182 Yesterday
» 4857 Week
» 16150 Month
» 280783 Year
» 1502348 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1113 m/e 10/1906
LNER (1924) 6113   06/09/1924
LNER (1946 1st) 1350   Not applied
LNER (1946 2nd) 1477   09/11/1946

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B9
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B910/1906
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 4814
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 10/1906
Withdrawal Mon 25/08/1947 off Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 40 yrs, 10 mths , 26 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 10/1906
GOR Gorton on 19/08/1921
TFD Trafford Park (LNER) on 14/07/1933
GOR Gorton on 19/07/1935
TFD Trafford Park (LNER) on 31/03/1936
GOR Gorton on 04/03/1937
TFD Trafford Park (LNER) on 13/04/1940
   Withdrawn on 25/08/1947

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1906 Diagram GC9 boiler fitted (number 1223)
02/06/1917 Diagram GC9 boiler fitted (number 1215)
16/08/1924 Diagram GC9 boiler fitted (number 1223)
12/12/1925 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 643)
11/04/1931 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1912)
01/07/1933 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1696)
01/02/1936 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 3722)
20/01/1940 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 901)
21/11/1942 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 915)
26/08/1944 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 525)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 21/04/1917 02/06/1917 43 days General
New left hand cylinder fitted
Boiler number 1215 (Diagram GC9)
 
Gorton Works 06/05/1922 15/07/1922 71 days General  
Gorton Works 12/04/1924 16/08/1924 127 days General
Boiler number 1223 (Diagram GC9)
 
Gorton Works 22/08/1925 12/12/1925 113 days General
Superheated boiler fitted
Boiler number 643 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 15/12/1928 26/01/1929 43 days General  
Gorton Works 14/03/1931 11/04/1931 29 days General
Boiler number 1912 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 10/06/1933 01/07/1933 22 days General
Boiler number 1696 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 11/01/1936 01/02/1936 22 days General
Boiler number 3722 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 25/09/1937 30/10/1937 36 days Heavy  
Gorton Works 30/12/1939 20/01/1940 22 days General
Boiler number 901 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 12/08/1941 20/09/1941 40 days Light Repair
Right hand cylinder loose
 
Gorton Works 31/10/1942 21/11/1942 22 days General
Boiler number 915 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 19/01/1944 29/01/1944 11 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 29/07/1944 26/08/1944 29 days General
Boiler number 525 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 25/08/1947 25/08/1947 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1906 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 1113
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4814
Diagram GC9 boiler fitted
   
21/04/1917 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1917. Dep: 02/06/1917.
Work undertaken:
New left hand cylinder fitted
Boiler number 1215 (Diagram GC9)
   
19/08/1921 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
06/05/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/05/1922. Dep: 15/07/1922.    
12/04/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1924. Dep: 16/08/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1223 (Diagram GC9)
   
06/09/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 6113    
22/08/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/08/1925. Dep: 12/12/1925.
Work undertaken:
Superheated boiler fitted
Boiler number 643 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
15/12/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/12/1928. Dep: 26/01/1929.    
14/03/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/03/1931. Dep: 11/04/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1912 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
10/06/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/06/1933. Dep: 01/07/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1696 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
14/07/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD)    
19/07/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
11/01/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1936. Dep: 01/02/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3722 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
31/03/1936 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD)    
04/03/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
25/09/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 25/09/1937. Dep: 30/10/1937.    
30/12/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/12/1939. Dep: 20/01/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 901 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
13/04/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD)    
12/08/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/08/1941. Dep: 20/09/1941.
Work undertaken:
Right hand cylinder loose
   
31/10/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/10/1942. Dep: 21/11/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 915 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
19/01/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/01/1944. Dep: 29/01/1944.    
29/07/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/07/1944. Dep: 26/08/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 525 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 1350 but not taken up    
09/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1477    
25/08/1947 Withdrawn Condemned as 1477 from Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD)    
25/08/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 25/08/1947. Dep: 25/08/1947.    

prev prev