Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 892 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14298 Week
» 67314 Month
» 186841 Year
» 3213694 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1502 |
m/e |
02/1912 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8502 |
m/e |
01/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1942) |
7417 |
m/e |
Not applied |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1502 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
British Railways |
61502 |
m/e |
06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Holden |
Class |
B12 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
S69 |
To Service |
During 02/1912 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 30/04/1954 |
Service Life |
42 yrs, 2 mths , 30 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1954 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
02/1912 |
KEI |
|
Keith |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
30/04/1954 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
on |
30/04/1954 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
01/1929 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
05/06/1949 |
Inverurie Works |
Locomotives entering Works 9/5 to 5/6: These included Nos. 61502, 4484, 5232/57, 65281, 5307, 65340. ex L.M.S. No. 4251. |
SLS/194907 |
31/07/1952 |
Keith MPD |
Engines at Keith shed were 62231, 62225/42/56/65/8/9/72/5, 61502/7/8, 67292, 54473 an 57597. |
SLS/195208 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1912 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1502 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
01/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8502 |
|
|
01/1929 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
1942 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 7417 but not taken up |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1502 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Keith (KEI) |
|
|
06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61502 |
|
|
30/04/1954 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61502 |
|
|
10/1954 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|