Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1486 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19289 Week
» 72305 Month
» 191832 Year
» 3218685 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1503 |
m/e |
03/1912 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8503 |
m/e |
01/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1942) |
7418 |
m/e |
Not applied |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1503 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
61503 |
m/e |
04/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Holden |
Class |
B12 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
S69 |
To Service |
During 03/1912 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 20/05/1951 |
Service Life |
39 yrs, 2 mths , 21 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
03/1912 |
KEI |
|
Keith |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
20/05/1951 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
on |
25/05/1951 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
04/1928 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
04/1931 |
ACFI feed water heating apparatus fitted |
11/1937 |
ACFI feed water heating apparatus removed |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/12/1949 |
Inverurie Works |
Locomotives entering Works during December: These included Nos. 61503, 62272/75, 64496, 4505, 64536, 65242, 5329, ex-L.M.S. 15224, 16278, 17347, 17460, 17611. |
SLS/195002 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1912 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1503 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
01/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8503 |
|
|
04/1928 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
04/1931 |
Modification |
Modification: ACFI feed water heating apparatus fitted |
|
|
11/1937 |
Modification |
Modification: ACFI feed water heating apparatus removed |
|
|
1942 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 7418 but not taken up |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1503 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Keith (KEI) |
|
|
04/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61503 |
|
|
20/05/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61503 |
|
|