Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1131 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18934 Week
» 71950 Month
» 191477 Year
» 3218330 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1512 |
m/e |
06/1913 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8512 |
m/e |
01/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1942) |
7426 |
m/e |
01/1943 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1512 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
61512 |
m/e |
11/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Holden |
Class |
B12 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
A73 |
To Service |
During 06/1913 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 01/01/1957 |
Service Life |
43 yrs, 7 mths , 1 dy |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1957 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
06/1913 |
COL |
|
Colchester |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
30A |
|
Stratford |
4w/e |
19/12/1953 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
01/01/1957 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
30A |
Stratford |
4w/e |
26/12/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
01/01/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
07/1928 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
12/1932 |
ACFI feed water heating apparatus fitted |
10/1937 |
ACFI feed water heating apparatus removed |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1913 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1512 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
01/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8512 |
|
|
07/1928 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
12/1932 |
Modification |
Modification: ACFI feed water heating apparatus fitted |
|
|
10/1937 |
Modification |
Modification: ACFI feed water heating apparatus removed |
|
|
01/1943 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7426 |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1512 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Colchester (COL) |
|
|
11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61512 |
|
|
19/12/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
01/01/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61512 |
|
|
02/1957 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|