Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 297 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18100 Week
» 71116 Month
» 190643 Year
» 3217496 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1514 |
m/e |
06/1913 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8514 |
m/e |
01/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1942) |
7428 |
m/e |
Not applied |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1514 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
61514 |
m/e |
07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Holden |
Class |
B12 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
A73 |
To Service |
During 06/1913 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 07/10/1959 |
Service Life |
46 yrs, 4 mths , 6 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1959 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
03/1929 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
11/1932 |
ACFI feed water heating apparatus fitted |
02/1938 |
ACFI feed water heating apparatus removed |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
19/04/1958 |
Cromer MPD |
The allocation at Beach shed is-B12/3, 61514/6/42/7/68 and B1 61312; the latter works usually on the Melton Constable branch and the B12's on Norwich trains. |
SLS/195805 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1913 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1514 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
01/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8514 |
|
|
03/1929 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
11/1932 |
Modification |
Modification: ACFI feed water heating apparatus fitted |
|
|
02/1938 |
Modification |
Modification: ACFI feed water heating apparatus removed |
|
|
1942 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 7428 but not taken up |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1514 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61514 |
|
|
19/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
26/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (32D) |
|
|
23/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (32D) |
|
|
22/01/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
19/03/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (32D) |
|
|
23/07/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
07/10/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61514 |
|
|
11/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|