Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 857 Today
» 862 Yesterday
» 4405 Week
» 5295 Month
» 313276 Year
» 1197657 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GER 1516 m/e 11/1913
LNER (1924) 8516 m/e 01/1924
LNER (1942) 7430 m/e Not applied
LNER (1946) 1516 m/e 01/1947
BR 61516 m/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer S. Holden
Class B12
Company History GER/LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number E75
To Service During 11/1913
Withdrawal Mon 14/07/1958
Scrapping During 09/1958
Service Life 44 yrs, 8 mths , 13 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
IPS Ipswich 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
35B Grantham 5w/e 19/01/1957
31C Kings Lynn 5w/e 20/04/1957
31A Cambridge 4w/e 19/10/1957
   Withdrawn 14/07/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC NOR Norwich Thorpe m/e 03/12/1945
ALLOC IPS Ipswich 24/08/1947
ALLOC STR Stratford w/e 29/05/1948
ALLOC 35B Grantham 4w/e 26/01/1957
ALLOC 31C Kings Lynn 4w/e 20/04/1957
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 02/11/1957
WDN   14/07/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1926 Lentz valve gear fitted
06/1928 Vacuum Ejector fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1913 To Service To service as GER Number 1516
Built at Stratford Works
   
01/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 8516    
12/1926 Modification Modification: Lentz valve gear fitted    
06/1928 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
1942 Number Allocated Allocated number 7430 but not taken up    
01/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 1516    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Ipswich (IPS)    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61516    
19/01/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (35B)    
20/04/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C)    
19/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
14/07/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 61516    

prev prev