Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 3585 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16991 Week
» 70007 Month
» 189534 Year
» 3216387 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1516 |
m/e |
11/1913 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8516 |
m/e |
01/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1942) |
7430 |
m/e |
Not applied |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1516 |
m/e |
01/1947 |
British Railways |
61516 |
m/e |
04/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Holden |
Class |
B12 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
E75 |
To Service |
During 11/1913 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 14/07/1958 |
Service Life |
44 yrs, 8 mths , 13 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1958 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
12/1926 |
Lentz valve gear fitted |
06/1928 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
19/04/1958 |
Cromer MPD |
The allocation at Beach shed is-B12/3, 61514/6/42/7/68 and B1 61312; the latter works usually on the Melton Constable branch and the B12's on Norwich trains. |
SLS/195805 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1913 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1516 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
01/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8516 |
|
|
12/1926 |
Modification |
Modification: Lentz valve gear fitted |
|
|
06/1928 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
1942 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 7430 but not taken up |
|
|
01/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1516 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ipswich (IPS) |
|
|
29/05/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (STR) |
|
|
04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61516 |
|
|
19/01/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Grantham (35B) |
|
|
20/04/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C) |
|
|
19/10/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
14/07/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61516 |
|
|
09/1958 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|