Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 108 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17911 Week
» 70927 Month
» 190454 Year
» 3217307 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1523 |
m/e |
05/1914 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8523 |
m/e |
01/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1942) |
7437 |
m/e |
11/1942 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1523 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
British Railways |
61523 |
m/e |
04/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Holden |
Class |
B12 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
R75 |
To Service |
During 05/1914 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 21/03/1955 |
Service Life |
40 yrs, 10 mths , 19 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
05/1914 |
COL |
|
Colchester |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
30A |
|
Stratford |
4w/e |
19/12/1953 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
21/03/1955 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
30A |
Stratford |
4w/e |
26/12/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
21/03/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
12/1927 |
ACFI feed water heating apparatus fitted |
05/1928 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
09/1935 |
ACFI feed water heating apparatus removed |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1914 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1523 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
01/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8523 |
|
|
12/1927 |
Modification |
Modification: ACFI feed water heating apparatus fitted |
|
|
05/1928 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
09/1935 |
Modification |
Modification: ACFI feed water heating apparatus removed |
|
|
11/1942 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7437 |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1523 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Colchester (COL) |
|
|
04/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61523 |
|
|
19/12/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
21/03/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61523 |
|
|