Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1426 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14832 Week
» 67848 Month
» 187375 Year
» 3214228 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1528 |
m/e |
08/1914 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8528 |
m/e |
01/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1942) |
7442 |
m/e |
Not applied |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1528 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
British Railways |
61528 |
m/e |
11/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Holden |
Class |
B12 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
R75 |
To Service |
During 08/1914 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 01/07/1953 |
Service Life |
38 yrs, 11 mths , 0 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
08/1914 |
KIT |
|
Kittybrewster |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
01/07/1953 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
on |
01/07/1953 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
03/1928 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
04/1933 |
ACFI feed water heating apparatus fitted |
03/1939 |
ACFI feed water heating apparatus removed |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/07/1951 |
G.N.O.S. Section - Keith |
In an afternoon's observation at the Junction B1's 61343/8/52, D41's 62231/56, D40's 62262, 62264/9, and B12/1 61508 were seen. The B1's were in excellent condition. The others were just clean. 62269 has a crest and also a tender cab. 62231 in plain black appeared hauling a director's special, since involved in a crash at Dalguise on 1st August. 61508 was still in green as was 61528 seen at Craigellachie Junction: The Aberdeen-Inverness and a goods were both worked from Keith by Cal. 4-4-0's of 60A. The station was in the process of being repainted. |
SLS/195109 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1914 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1528 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
01/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8528 |
|
|
03/1928 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
04/1933 |
Modification |
Modification: ACFI feed water heating apparatus fitted |
|
|
03/1939 |
Modification |
Modification: ACFI feed water heating apparatus removed |
|
|
1942 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 7442 but not taken up |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1528 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Kittybrewster (KIT) |
|
|
11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61528 |
|
|
01/07/1953 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61528 |
|
|