Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 68 Today
» 947 Yesterday
» 1015 Week
» 19797 Month
» 268090 Year
» 1152471 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GER 1530 m/e 11/1914
LNER (1924) 8530 m/e 01/1924
LNER (1942) 7444 m/e Not applied
LNER (1946) 1530 m/e 11/1946
BR 61530 m/e 05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer S. Holden
Class B12
Company History GER/LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number M77
To Service During 11/1914
Withdrawal Mon 09/11/1959
Scrapping During 11/1959
Service Life 45 yrs , 9 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
STR Stratford 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
32B Ipswich 4w/e 21/10/1950
32A Norwich Thorpe 5w/e 24/03/1951
32F Yarmouth Beach 4w/e 19/05/1951
32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 19/09/1953
32F Yarmouth Beach 4w/e 19/06/1954
32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 31/01/1959
31A Cambridge w/e 13/06/1959
   Withdrawn 09/11/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC YB Yarmouth Beach w/e 29/05/1948
ALLOC 32B Ipswich w/e 16/10/1950
ALLOC 32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 25/02/1951
ALLOC 32F Yarmouth Beach w/e 19/05/1951
ALLOC 32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 05/09/1953
ALLOC 32F Yarmouth Beach 4w/e 19/06/1954
ALLOC 32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 21/02/1959
TOSTORE   4w/e 21/03/1959
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 13/06/1959
WDN   09/11/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1928 Vacuum Ejector fitted
04/1932 ACFI feed water heating apparatus fitted
05/1938 ACFI feed water heating apparatus removed


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1914 To Service To service as GER Number 1530
Built at Stratford Works
   
01/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 8530    
11/1928 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
04/1932 Modification Modification: ACFI feed water heating apparatus fitted    
05/1938 Modification Modification: ACFI feed water heating apparatus removed    
1942 Number Allocated Allocated number 7444 but not taken up    
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1530    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61530    
21/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
24/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
19/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Yarmouth Beach (32F)    
19/09/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
19/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Yarmouth Beach (32F)    
31/01/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
13/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
09/11/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 61530    

prev prev