Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 151 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 151 Week
» 18933 Month
» 267226 Year
» 1151607 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GER 1533 m/e 12/1914
LNER (1924) 8533 m/e 01/1924
LNER (1942) 7447 m/e Not applied
LNER (1946) 1533 m/e 12/1946
BR 61533 m/e 04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer S. Holden
Class B12
Company History GER/LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number M77
To Service During 12/1914
Withdrawal Tue 03/11/1959
Scrapping During 01/1960
Service Life 44 yrs, 11 mths , 4 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
STR Stratford 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
32B Ipswich 4w/e 19/07/1952
31D South Lynn 4w/e 15/11/1952
32D Yarmouth South Town 4w/e 18/04/1953
32B Ipswich 4w/e 23/01/1954
32D Yarmouth South Town 5w/e 24/04/1954
32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 22/01/1955
32B Ipswich 4w/e 20/08/1955
32F Yarmouth Beach 4w/e 14/12/1957
32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 31/01/1959
31A Cambridge w/e 13/06/1959
   Withdrawn 03/11/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC SL South Lynn w/e 28/08/1948
ALLOC 32B Ipswich 4w/e 12/07/1952
ALLOC 31D South Lynn 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 32D Yarmouth South Town 4w/e 18/04/1953
ALLOC 32B Ipswich 4w/e 23/01/1954
ALLOC 32D Yarmouth South Town 4w/e 24/04/1954
ALLOC 32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 29/01/1955
ALLOC 32B Ipswich 4w/e 13/08/1955
ALLOC 32F Yarmouth Beach 4w/e 30/11/1957
ALLOC 32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 21/02/1959
TOSTORE   4w/e 21/03/1959
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 13/06/1959
WDN   03/11/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1924 Vacuum Ejector fitted
09/1929 Lentz valve gear fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1914 To Service To service as GER Number 1533
Built at Stratford Works
   
01/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 8533    
05/1924 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
09/1929 Modification Modification: Lentz valve gear fitted    
1942 Number Allocated Allocated number 7447 but not taken up    
12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1533    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
04/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61533    
19/07/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
15/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to South Lynn (31D)    
18/04/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (32D)    
23/01/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
24/04/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (32D)    
22/01/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
20/08/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
14/12/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Yarmouth Beach (32F)    
31/01/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
13/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
03/11/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 61533    

prev prev