Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 493 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18296 Week
» 71312 Month
» 190839 Year
» 3217692 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1541 |
m/e |
06/1920 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8541 |
m/e |
01/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1942) |
7455 |
m/e |
Not applied |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1541 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
British Railways |
61541 |
m/e |
02/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Holden |
Class |
B12 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow |
Order Number |
W82 |
Works Number |
135 |
To Service |
During 06/1920 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 01/01/1957 |
Service Life |
36 yrs, 7 mths , 1 dy |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1957 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
06/1920 |
STR |
|
Stratford |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
GRA |
|
Grantham |
w/e |
26/11/1949 |
GRA |
|
Grantham |
m/e |
30/11/1949 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
01/01/1957 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
GRA |
Grantham |
w/e |
26/11/1949 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
01/01/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
05/1928 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1920 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1541 Built at Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow, Works Number 135 |
|
|
01/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8541 |
|
|
05/1928 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
1942 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 7455 but not taken up |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1541 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
02/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61541 |
|
|
26/11/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) |
|
|
30/11/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) |
|
|
01/01/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61541 |
|
|
02/1957 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|