Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 54 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17857 Week
» 70873 Month
» 190400 Year
» 3217253 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1546 |
m/e |
09/1920 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8546 |
m/e |
01/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1942) |
7460 |
m/e |
Not applied |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1546 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
61546 |
m/e |
03/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Holden |
Class |
B12 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow |
Order Number |
W82 |
Works Number |
140 |
To Service |
During 09/1920 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 11/05/1959 |
Service Life |
38 yrs, 8 mths , 10 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1959 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
09/1920 |
STR |
|
Stratford |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
31A |
|
Cambridge |
4w/e |
16/02/1957 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
11/05/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
COL |
Colchester |
m/e |
03/12/1945 |
ALLOC |
COL |
Colchester |
on |
07/12/1946 |
ALLOC |
STR |
Stratford |
on |
28/12/1946 |
ALLOC |
31A |
Cambridge |
4w/e |
23/02/1957 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
11/05/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
03/1927 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
02/1932 |
ACFI feed water heating apparatus fitted |
02/1938 |
ACFI feed water heating apparatus removed |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
12/08/1957 |
Bury St. Edmunds |
No transfers are now being recorded between Cambridge (31A) and Bury (31E). Its sub-depot, Sudbury, is supplied by 31A. The present allocation of Bury is 61546/53/4/67/73/6, 62543, 65391, 68497, 69616/20. |
SLS/195709 |
09/01/1959 |
Oxford |
B21 61546 (31A) worked the through Cambridge turn on 9th January. |
SLS/195902 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1920 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1546 Built at Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow, Works Number 140 |
|
|
01/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8546 |
|
|
03/1927 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
02/1932 |
Modification |
Modification: ACFI feed water heating apparatus fitted |
|
|
02/1938 |
Modification |
Modification: ACFI feed water heating apparatus removed |
|
|
1942 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 7460 but not taken up |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1546 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61546 |
|
|
16/02/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
05/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
11/05/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61546 |
|
|