|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
19/04/1958 | Cromer MPD | The allocation at Beach shed is-B12/3, 61514/6/42/7/68 and B1 61312; the latter works usually on the Melton Constable branch and the B12's on Norwich trains. | SLS/195805 |
31/12/1958 | Stratford Works (Waiting Cut Up) | Old Works-61003 (30F), 43107 (31D), 61066 (31A), 61089 (30A), 61136 (14D), 61160 (32B), 61164 (30A), 61254 (32B), 61299 (40E), 61361 (30E), 61372 (30A), 61632 (31A), 64677 (30A), 64965 (33A), 65561 (32B), 69695-Wdn., 80079 (33B). Diesel Shop-12064 (14A), 15214 (75C), D208 (34B), D2208 (30A), D2210 (32A), D2214 (32A), D3221 (75C), D3444 (34A), D3460 (73C), D3476 (34C), D5514 (30A), D8407 (30A). Waiting Wks.-61336 (30E), 61573 (31E), 61576 (31E), 62571 (40A), 62582 (31A), 62610 (31C), 64651 (30E), 64672 (31B), 64688 (31A), 68625 (32D), 68630 (30A), 68636 (30A), 69610 (30A), 69616 (31A), 69703 (30A), 69717 (30A), Departmental 36. Stripping-62614, 69608/41. Foundry-65568, 65587, 69624. On Shed Ex Wks.-D2573 (32G), D3217 (75A). Waiting Cut Up-61547/61/4, 62518/34/6/43/5/66/72/88/615, 62788, 64645, 65390/438/41/4, 65504/74, 68529/41/616/8/32, 68653/7/9/62/6, 69628. | SLS/195902 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/1920 | To Service | To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1547 Built at Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow, Works Number 141 |
||
01/1924 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 8547 | ||
07/1927 | Modification | Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted | ||
1942 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 7461 but not taken up | ||
09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1547 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) | ||
09/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 61547 | ||
25/12/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to South Lynn (SL) | ||
25/09/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) | ||
13/10/1958 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61547 | ||
01/1959 | Scrapped | Scrapped |