Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 147 Today
» 862 Yesterday
» 3695 Week
» 4585 Month
» 312566 Year
» 1196947 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GER 1553 m/e 12/1920
LNER (1924) 8553 m/e 01/1924
LNER (1942) 7467 m/e 11/1942
LNER (1946) 1553 m/e 09/1946
BR 61553 m/e 11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer S. Holden
Class B12
Company History GER/LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow
Order Number W82
Works Number 147
To Service During 12/1920
Withdrawal Mon 25/08/1958
Service Life 37 yrs, 8 mths , 26 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
COL Colchester 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
GRA Grantham m/e 30/11/1949
31A Cambridge 5w/e 20/04/1957
   Withdrawn 25/08/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC STR Stratford 07/12/1946
ALLOC COL Colchester 28/12/1946
ALLOC STR Stratford w/e 16/04/1949
ALLOC GRA Grantham w/e 17/12/1949
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 20/04/1957
WDN   25/08/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1927 Vacuum Ejector fitted
06/1932 ACFI feed water heating apparatus fitted
05/1937 ACFI feed water heating apparatus removed


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1920 To Service To service as GER Number 1553
Built at Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow, Works Number 147
   
01/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 8553    
08/1927 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
06/1932 Modification Modification: ACFI feed water heating apparatus fitted    
05/1937 Modification Modification: ACFI feed water heating apparatus removed    
11/1942 Renumbered Renumbered to 7467    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1553    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Colchester (COL)    
11/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61553    
30/11/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (GRA)    
20/04/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
25/08/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 61553    

prev prev