Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 216 Today
» 1073 Yesterday
» 216 Week
» 11787 Month
» 260080 Year
» 1144461 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GER 1554 m/e 01/1921
LNER (1924) 8554 m/e 01/1924
LNER (1942) 7468 m/e Not applied
LNER (1946) 1554 m/e 10/1946
BR 61554 m/e 01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer S. Holden
Class B12
Company History GER/LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow
Order Number W82
Works Number 148
To Service During 01/1921
Withdrawal Mon 15/09/1958
Scrapping During 02/1959
Service Life 37 yrs, 8 mths , 15 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
STR Stratford 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
35C Spital Bridge 5w/e 24/03/1956
31A Cambridge 4w/e 16/03/1957
   Withdrawn 15/09/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC GRA Grantham w/e 24/12/1949
ALLOC 35C Spital Bridge 5w/e 31/03/1956
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 23/03/1957
WDN   15/09/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1924 Vacuum Ejector fitted
08/1932 ACFI feed water heating apparatus fitted
11/1935 ACFI feed water heating apparatus removed


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1921 To Service To service as GER Number 1554
Built at Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow, Works Number 148
   
01/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 8554    
06/1924 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
08/1932 Modification Modification: ACFI feed water heating apparatus fitted    
11/1935 Modification Modification: ACFI feed water heating apparatus removed    
1942 Number Allocated Allocated number 7468 but not taken up    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1554    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
01/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61554    
24/03/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C)    
16/03/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
15/09/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 61554    

prev prev