Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 704 Today
» 947 Yesterday
» 1651 Week
» 20433 Month
» 268726 Year
» 1153107 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GER 1555 m/e 01/1921
LNER (1924) 8555 m/e 01/1924
LNER (1942) 7469 m/e Not applied
LNER (1946) 1555 m/e 09/1946
BR 61555 m/e 09/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer S. Holden
Class B12
Company History GER/LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow
Order Number W82
Works Number 149
To Service During 01/1921
Withdrawal Mon 07/10/1957
Scrapping During 02/1958
Service Life 36 yrs, 9 mths , 6 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
STR Stratford 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
30A Stratford 4w/e 19/12/1953
30E Colchester 4w/e 17/11/1956
35B Grantham 5w/e 19/01/1957
31A Cambridge 5w/e 20/04/1957
   Withdrawn 07/10/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC COL Colchester w/e 07/02/1948
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 26/12/1953
ALLOC 30E Colchester 4w/e 10/11/1956
ALLOC 35B Grantham 4w/e 26/01/1957
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 20/04/1957
WDN   07/10/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1927 Vacuum Ejector fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1921 To Service To service as GER Number 1555
Built at Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow, Works Number 149
   
01/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 8555    
03/1927 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
1942 Number Allocated Allocated number 7469 but not taken up    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1555    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
09/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61555    
19/12/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
17/11/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
19/01/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (35B)    
20/04/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
07/10/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 61555    

prev prev