Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 1036 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18839 Week
» 71855 Month
» 191382 Year
» 3218235 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1556 |
m/e |
02/1921 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8556 |
m/e |
01/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1942) |
7470 |
m/e |
11/1942 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1556 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
61556 |
m/e |
11/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Holden |
Class |
B12 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow |
Order Number |
W82 |
Works Number |
150 |
To Service |
During 02/1921 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 23/12/1957 |
Service Life |
36 yrs, 10 mths , 22 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1958 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
03/1929 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
01/1932 |
ACFI feed water heating apparatus fitted |
05/1935 |
ACFI feed water heating apparatus removed |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1921 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1556 Built at Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow, Works Number 150 |
|
|
01/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8556 |
|
|
03/1929 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
01/1932 |
Modification |
Modification: ACFI feed water heating apparatus fitted |
|
|
05/1935 |
Modification |
Modification: ACFI feed water heating apparatus removed |
|
|
11/1942 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7470 |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1556 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
07/02/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (COL) |
|
|
11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61556 |
|
|
19/12/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
17/11/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (30E) |
|
|
19/01/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
23/12/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61556 |
|
|
05/1958 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|