|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
25/03/1950 | Stratford Works | One of the two 0-4-0T tram engines-No. 68083- has just been through shops. The crest is on the undercarriage, below the wooden body. One of the 0-6-0T tram engines has the words 'British Railways' in the same position, and does not look as neat. Locomotives in the new shops were Nos. 61004/42/50/54/89, 61332/35. 1639. 62531, 3040. 63101, 7160, 68527, 69704, 90013, 90502. ex-W.D. 77013, 79312 and outside awaiting shopping were Nos. 61235, 61559, 8386, 8647, 9684, 90392. The three Crane locomotives are now renumbered; No. 68667 noted 3/49, No. 68668 2/50 and No. 68669 3/50 (with crest). These dates are not given in the official lists, and the actual dates will be slightly earlier. In the Paint Shop were Nos. 61540 (lined), 61554. 68088, 68225, 68651, 69641, 69728; and in the old Works Nos. 61058, 61336, 61558, 62509, 2584, 2601. 62790, 2794, 4644/83, 65462, 65545/57, 7155, 7226, 8375, 8519/61, 8772, 8874/81, 9639/69. | SLS/195005 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/1921 | To Service | To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1558 Built at Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow, Works Number 152 |
||
01/1924 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 8558 | ||
06/1924 | Modification | Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted | ||
01/1943 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 7472 | ||
10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1558 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) | ||
07/02/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colchester (COL) | ||
06/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 61558 | ||
19/12/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
17/11/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colchester (30E) | ||
19/01/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C) | ||
16/03/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) | ||
20/04/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C) | ||
14/12/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) | ||
13/04/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61558 | ||
05/1959 | Scrapped | Scrapped |