Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 236 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 5580 Week
» 6470 Month
» 314451 Year
» 1198832 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GER 1558 m/e 02/1921
LNER (1924) 8558 m/e 01/1924
LNER (1942) 7472 m/e 01/1943
LNER (1946) 1558 m/e 10/1946
BR 61558 m/e 06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer S. Holden
Class B12
Company History GER/LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow
Order Number W82
Works Number 152
To Service During 02/1921
Withdrawal Mon 13/04/1959
Scrapping During 05/1959
Service Life 38 yrs, 2 mths , 13 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
STR Stratford 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
30A Stratford 4w/e 19/12/1953
30E Colchester 4w/e 17/11/1956
35C Spital Bridge 5w/e 19/01/1957
31A Cambridge 4w/e 16/03/1957
31C Kings Lynn 5w/e 20/04/1957
31A Cambridge 4w/e 14/12/1957
   Withdrawn 13/04/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC COL Colchester m/e 03/12/1945
ALLOC COL Colchester w/e 07/02/1948
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 26/12/1953
ALLOC 30E Colchester 4w/e 10/11/1956
ALLOC 35C Spital Bridge 4w/e 26/01/1957
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 23/03/1957
ALLOC 31C Kings Lynn 4w/e 20/04/1957
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 30/11/1957
WDN   13/04/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1924 Vacuum Ejector fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1921 To Service To service as GER Number 1558
Built at Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow, Works Number 152
   
01/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 8558    
06/1924 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
01/1943 Renumbered Renumbered to 7472    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1558    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61558    
19/12/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
17/11/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
19/01/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C)    
16/03/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
20/04/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C)    
14/12/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
13/04/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 61558    

prev prev