Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 632 Today
» 1270 Yesterday
» 6995 Week
» 9577 Month
» 274210 Year
» 1495775 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GER 1559 m/e 02/1921
LNER (1924) 8559 m/e 01/1924
LNER (1942) 7473 m/e Not applied
LNER (1946) 1559 m/e 07/1946
BR 61559 m/e 08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer S. Holden
Class B12
Company History GER/LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow
Order Number W82
Works Number 153
To Service During 02/1921
Withdrawal Mon 03/09/1951
Service Life 30 yrs, 7 mths , 3 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 02/1921
STR Stratford 01/01/1948
30E Colchester 5w/e 23/06/1951
   Withdrawn 03/09/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 30E Colchester w/e 26/05/1951
WDN   03/09/1951

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1928 Vacuum Ejector fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
25/03/1950 Stratford Works One of the two 0-4-0T tram engines-No. 68083- has just been through shops. The crest is on the undercarriage, below the wooden body. One of the 0-6-0T tram engines has the words 'British Railways' in the same position, and does not look as neat. Locomotives in the new shops were Nos. 61004/42/50/54/89, 61332/35. 1639. 62531, 3040. 63101, 7160, 68527, 69704, 90013, 90502. ex-W.D. 77013, 79312 and outside awaiting shopping were Nos. 61235, 61559, 8386, 8647, 9684, 90392. The three Crane locomotives are now renumbered; No. 68667 noted 3/49, No. 68668 2/50 and No. 68669 3/50 (with crest). These dates are not given in the official lists, and the actual dates will be slightly earlier. In the Paint Shop were Nos. 61540 (lined), 61554. 68088, 68225, 68651, 69641, 69728; and in the old Works Nos. 61058, 61336, 61558, 62509, 2584, 2601. 62790, 2794, 4644/83, 65462, 65545/57, 7155, 7226, 8375, 8519/61, 8772, 8874/81, 9639/69. SLS/195005

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1921 To Service To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1559
Built at Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow, Works Number 153
   
01/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 8559    
05/1928 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
1942 Number Allocated Allocated number 7473 but not taken up    
07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1559    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61559    
23/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
03/09/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 61559    

prev prev