Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1473 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 15516 Week
» 80470 Month
» 283134 Year
» 3309987 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8571 |
m/e |
01/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1942) |
7485 |
m/e |
Not applied |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1571 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
British Railways |
61571 |
m/e |
10/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Holden |
Class |
B12 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Order Number |
1513 |
Works Number |
6487 |
To Service |
During 08/1928 |
Withdrawal |
During 12/1959 |
Service Life |
31 yrs, 3 mths , 30 dys |
Information |
Vacuum ejector and Lentz valve gear fitted from new |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1960 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8571 |
|
|
1942 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 7485 but not taken up |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1571 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61571 |
|
|
14/02/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Grantham (35B) |
|
|
21/03/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
14/12/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
12/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61571 |
|
|
01/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|