Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 762 Today
» 1201 Yesterday
» 4278 Week
» 32236 Month
» 66878 Year
» 1288443 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 8572 m/e 01/1924
LNER (1942) 7486 m/e Not applied
LNER (1946) 1572 m/e 06/1946
BR 61572 m/e 05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer S. Holden
Class B12
Company History GER/LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number 1513
Works Number 6488
To Service During 08/1928
Withdrawal Wed 20/09/1961
Service Life 33 yrs, 1 mth , 20 dys
Information Vacuum ejector and Lentz valve gear fitted from new

Allocations
Code Name From Date
STR Stratford 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
35B Grantham 4w/e 14/02/1953
32B Ipswich 5w/e 21/03/1953
32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 17/10/1959
   Withdrawn 20/09/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 35A New England 4w/e 21/02/1953
ALLOC 32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 31/10/1959
WDN   20/09/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown
Status Date 17/09/2018


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 8572    
1942 Number Allocated Allocated number 7486 but not taken up    
06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1572    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61572    
14/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (35B)    
21/03/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
17/10/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
20/09/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 61572