Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 2 Today
» 954 Yesterday
» 2863 Week
» 21645 Month
» 269938 Year
» 1154319 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 8573 m/e 01/1924
LNER (1942) 7487 m/e Not applied
LNER (1946) 1573 m/e 05/1946
BR 61573 m/e 08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer S. Holden
Class B12
Company History GER/LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number 1513
Works Number 6489
To Service During 08/1928
Withdrawal Thu 01/01/1959
Scrapping During 04/1959
Service Life 30 yrs, 5 mths , 1 dy
Information Vacuum ejector and Lentz valve gear fitted from new

Allocations
Code Name From Date
STR Stratford 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
31A Cambridge 4w/e 16/03/1957
   Withdrawn 01/01/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 23/02/1957
WDN   01/01/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 8573    
1942 Number Allocated Allocated number 7487 but not taken up    
05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1573    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61573    
16/03/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
01/01/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 61573