Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 886 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14292 Week
» 67308 Month
» 186835 Year
» 3213688 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8574 |
m/e |
01/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1942) |
7488 |
m/e |
01/1943 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1574 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
61574 |
m/e |
03/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Holden |
Class |
B12 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Order Number |
1513 |
Works Number |
6490 |
To Service |
During 08/1928 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 01/01/1957 |
Service Life |
28 yrs, 5 mths , 1 dy |
Information |
Vacuum ejector and Lentz valve gear fitted from new |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1957 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
08/1928 |
STR |
|
Stratford |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
35B |
|
Grantham |
4w/e |
14/02/1953 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
01/01/1957 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
35A |
New England |
4w/e |
21/02/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
01/01/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/03/1948 |
Stratford Works |
The following withdrawn locomotives (all marked 'Darlington') were in the fields behind the new Works: Nos. 5383, 7120/37, 7511/12; with the exception of No. 7137, the rest had gone on 3/4, presumably to Darlington. Nos. 5399, 5410/18, 7130/32 an 8213 (all withdrawn) which were formerly in the fields are now dumped on the road next to the stripping shop. Nos. 7131/35 were being cut up in the Paint Shop. The following W.D. 2-8-0's were newly painted and had been through shops recently:-Nos. 70867/874, 78580, 78605/675, 79205/233. By the type of lettering some appeared to have been dealt with in Belgium. Nos. 1530, 1639, 1766, 4773 an 9652 had been newly painted, prefixed 'E' and lettered 'British Railways,' while those noted renumbered (60000 added) were:-Nos. 1574, 7202, 9639 an 9659. |
SLS/194805 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8574 |
|
|
01/1943 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7488 |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1574 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
03/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61574 |
|
|
14/02/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Grantham (35B) |
|
|
01/01/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61574 |
|
|
02/1957 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|