|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
02/04/1959 | Stratford Works (Waiting Wks.) | Old Works, 43143 (40F), 61009 (40A), 61116 (14D), 61202 (40A), 61232 (30F), 61329 (30A), 61348 (31F), 61371 (31A), 61405 (40A), 64823 (40F), 69696 (30A). Diesel Sp., D206 (34B), 11138 (30F), 12078 (1A), 15203 (75C), D2550 (32B), D3094 (75A), D3301 (30A), D5304 (34B), D8404 (30A). Waiting Wks., 61575 (31A), 64650 (30E), 64677 (30A), 64715 (40E), 65556 (31A), 69637 (34C), 69669 (30A). Paint shop, 15215 (75C), 61375 (30A), Stripping Sp., 43105 (30A), 61573 Wdn, 69728 (30A). Foundry, 68541. Waiting cut up, 61566/76/80, 62536/82/8, 64651, 65467, 65574, 68574/638, 69600/10/6/9/23/7/34/5/59/66/76/716/31. | SLS/195905 |
05/01/1959 | Bury St. Edmunds MPD | From 5th January this shed became a diesel depot for Cambridge diesel cars and a diesel shunter; the last steam engines on shed (4th January) were J20s 64661/6/95, 65457/61; B12s 61573/5 were withdrawn from here on 1st January, 1959. | SLS/195902 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/1924 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 8575 | ||
1942 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 7489 but not taken up | ||
06/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1575 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) | ||
04/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 61575 | ||
19/01/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) | ||
20/04/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C) | ||
14/12/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) | ||
04/1959 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
06/04/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61575 |