Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 1046 Today
» 1253 Yesterday
» 8506 Week
» 6019 Month
» 233903 Year
» 1455468 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 8575 m/e 01/1924
LNER (1942) 7489 m/e Not applied
LNER (1946) 1575 m/e 06/1946
BR 61575 m/e 04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer S. Holden
Class B12
Company History GER/LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number 1513
Works Number 6491
To Service During 09/1928
Withdrawal Mon 06/04/1959
Scrapping During 04/1959
Service Life 30 yrs, 7 mths , 6 dys
Information Vacuum ejector and Lentz valve gear fitted from new

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1928
STR Stratford 01/01/1948
31A Cambridge 5w/e 19/01/1957
31C Kings Lynn 5w/e 20/04/1957
31A Cambridge 4w/e 14/12/1957
   Withdrawn 06/04/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 26/01/1957
ALLOC 31C Kings Lynn 4w/e 20/04/1957
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 30/11/1957
WDN   06/04/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
02/04/1959 Stratford Works (Waiting Wks.) Old Works, 43143 (40F), 61009 (40A), 61116 (14D), 61202 (40A), 61232 (30F), 61329 (30A), 61348 (31F), 61371 (31A), 61405 (40A), 64823 (40F), 69696 (30A). Diesel Sp., D206 (34B), 11138 (30F), 12078 (1A), 15203 (75C), D2550 (32B), D3094 (75A), D3301 (30A), D5304 (34B), D8404 (30A). Waiting Wks., 61575 (31A), 64650 (30E), 64677 (30A), 64715 (40E), 65556 (31A), 69637 (34C), 69669 (30A). Paint shop, 15215 (75C), 61375 (30A), Stripping Sp., 43105 (30A), 61573 Wdn, 69728 (30A). Foundry, 68541. Waiting cut up, 61566/76/80, 62536/82/8, 64651, 65467, 65574, 68574/638, 69600/10/6/9/23/7/34/5/59/66/76/716/31. SLS/195905

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 8575    
1942 Number Allocated Allocated number 7489 but not taken up    
06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1575    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
04/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61575    
19/01/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
20/04/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C)    
14/12/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
06/04/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 61575