Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 3880 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 22791 Week
» 87745 Month
» 290409 Year
» 3317262 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8579 |
m/e |
01/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1942) |
7493 |
m/e |
Not applied |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1579 |
on |
23/03/1946 |
British Railways |
61579 |
m/e |
10/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Holden |
Class |
B12 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Order Number |
1513 |
Works Number |
6495 |
To Service |
During 09/1928 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 01/01/1957 |
Service Life |
28 yrs, 4 mths , 1 dy |
Information |
Vacuum ejector and Lentz valve gear fitted from new |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1957 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
09/1928 |
STR |
|
Stratford |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
30E |
|
Colchester |
w/e |
24/11/1951 |
30A |
|
Stratford |
4w/e |
19/12/1953 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
01/01/1957 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
STR |
Stratford |
m/e |
03/12/1945 |
ALLOC |
30E |
Colchester |
w/e |
24/11/1951 |
ALLOC |
30A |
Stratford |
4w/e |
26/12/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
01/01/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8579 |
|
|
1942 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 7493 but not taken up |
|
|
23/03/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1579 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
10/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61579 |
|
|
24/11/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (30E) |
|
|
19/12/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
01/01/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61579 |
|
|
02/1957 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|