|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Unknown Works | 1911 | 09/1911 | General | Boiler number G499 (Diagram 54Sat) |
|||
Unknown Works | 1918 | 03/1918 | General | Superheated boiler fitted |
|||
Darlington Works | 12/03/1925 | 30/07/1925 | 141 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 04/05/1928 | 13/06/1928 | 41 days | Heavy | |||
Darlington Works | 09/04/1929 | 11/06/1929 | 64 days | General | Boiler number D1033 (Diagram 54Sup) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/1906 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 757 Built at Gateshead Works, Works Number 43 Allocated to Heaton (HTN) Diagram 54Sat boiler fitted |
||
1911 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Unknown Works (General) - Arr: ?/1911. Dep: ?/09/1911. Work undertaken: Boiler number G499 (Diagram 54Sat) |
||
1918 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Unknown Works (General) - Arr: ?/1918. Dep: ?/03/1918. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted |
||
07/03/1918 | Modification | Diagram 54Sup number D730 boiler fitted | ||
07/07/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
12/03/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1925. Dep: 30/07/1925. | ||
23/02/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
07/06/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
22/09/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
04/05/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 04/05/1928. Dep: 13/06/1928. | ||
19/07/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
09/04/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/04/1929. Dep: 11/06/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1033 (Diagram 54Sup) |
||
03/05/1932 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 757 from Hull Dairycoates (HLD) |