|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Unknown Works | 1911 | 05/1911 | General | Boiler number G342 (Diagram 54Sat) |
|||
Unknown Works | 1918 | 06/1918 | General | Superheated boiler fitted |
|||
Gateshead Works | 04/05/1923 | 08/06/1923 | 36 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 17/06/1926 | 26/10/1926 | 132 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 06/08/1928 | 31/08/1928 | 26 days | Light Repair |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1906 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1077 Built at Gateshead Works, Works Number 52 Allocated to Heaton (HTN) Diagram 54Sat boiler fitted |
||
1911 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Unknown Works (General) - Arr: ?/1911. Dep: ?/05/1911. Work undertaken: Boiler number G342 (Diagram 54Sat) |
||
1918 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Unknown Works (General) - Arr: ?/1918. Dep: ?/06/1918. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted |
||
07/06/1918 | Modification | Diagram 54Sup number D742 boiler fitted | ||
04/05/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/05/1923. Dep: 08/06/1923. | ||
01/07/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
17/06/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/06/1926. Dep: 26/10/1926. | ||
06/08/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/08/1928. Dep: 31/08/1928. | ||
06/11/1931 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 1077 from York (North) (YK) |