|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Unknown Works | 07/07/1904 | 07/10/1904 | 93 days | General | Boiler number G426 (Diagram 53Sat) |
||
Unknown Works | 07/07/1906 | 07/01/1906 | -180 days | General | |||
Unknown Works | 07/07/1908 | 07/01/1908 | -181 days | General | |||
Unknown Works | 1915 | 06/1915 | General | Superheated boiler fitted Boiler number D110 (Diagram 53Sup) Superheated boiler fitted |
|||
Unknown Works | 1921 | 03/1921 | General | ||||
Gateshead Works | 30/05/1924 | 23/07/1924 | 55 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 23/03/1927 | 29/07/1927 | 129 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 04/09/1928 | 24/09/1928 | 21 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 26/03/1929 | 24/04/1929 | 30 days | Light Repair |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1901 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2113 Built at Gateshead Works, Works Number 7.01 Allocated to Gateshead (GHD) Diagram 53Sat boiler fitted |
||
07/07/1904 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Unknown Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1904. Dep: 07/10/1904. Work undertaken: Boiler number G426 (Diagram 53Sat) |
||
01/1906 | Modification | Diagram 53Sat number G58 boiler fitted | ||
07/07/1906 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Unknown Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1906. Dep: 07/01/1906. | ||
01/1908 | Modification | Diagram 53Sat number G44 boiler fitted | ||
07/07/1908 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Unknown Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1908. Dep: 07/01/1908. | ||
1915 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Unknown Works (General) - Arr: ?/1915. Dep: ?/06/1915. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted Boiler number D110 (Diagram 53Sup) Superheated boiler fitted |
||
1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Unknown Works (General) - Arr: ?/1921. Dep: ?/03/1921. | ||
30/05/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/05/1924. Dep: 23/07/1924. | ||
07/11/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (HLB) | ||
07/02/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
07/07/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (SEL) | ||
28/09/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
23/03/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/03/1927. Dep: 29/07/1927. | ||
04/09/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/09/1928. Dep: 24/09/1928. | ||
26/03/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/03/1929. Dep: 24/04/1929. | ||
17/10/1930 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 2113 from Hull Dairycoates (HLD) |