|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Unknown Works | 1916 | 07/1916 | General | Boiler number D504 (Diagram 50) |
|||
Darlington Works | 26/04/1923 | 02/08/1923 | 99 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 09/11/1923 | 01/12/1923 | 23 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 30/09/1927 | 13/12/1927 | 75 days | General | Boiler number D918 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/05/1930 | 31/07/1930 | 88 days | General | Boiler number E4/18 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/05/1933 | 14/06/1933 | 44 days | General | Boiler number D872 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 28/11/1934 | 22/02/1935 | 87 days | Heavy | |||
Darlington Works | 04/08/1936 | 10/09/1936 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 2810 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/01/1937 | 25/03/1937 | 74 days | Light Repair | After collision |
||
Darlington Works | 23/09/1938 | 06/10/1938 | 14 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 17/04/1940 | 25/05/1940 | 39 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 18/03/1941 | 28/04/1941 | 42 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 14/01/1944 | 14/01/1944 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1912 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 822 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 50 boiler fitted |
||
1916 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Unknown Works (General) - Arr: ?/1916. Dep: ?/07/1916. Work undertaken: Boiler number D504 (Diagram 50) |
||
26/04/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/04/1923. Dep: 02/08/1923. | ||
09/11/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/11/1923. Dep: 01/12/1923. | ||
30/09/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/09/1927. Dep: 13/12/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number D918 (Diagram 50) |
||
05/05/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/05/1930. Dep: 31/07/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number E4/18 (Diagram 50) |
||
02/05/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/05/1933. Dep: 14/06/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number D872 (Diagram 50) |
||
28/11/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 28/11/1934. Dep: 22/02/1935. | ||
04/08/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1936. Dep: 10/09/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2810 (Diagram 50) |
||
11/01/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/01/1937. Dep: 25/03/1937. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
23/09/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/09/1938. Dep: 06/10/1938. | ||
14/04/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
17/04/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/04/1940. Dep: 25/05/1940. | ||
18/03/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/03/1941. Dep: 28/04/1941. | ||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
14/01/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 14/01/1944. Dep: 14/01/1944. | ||
05/02/1944 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 822 from Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 1324 but not taken up |