Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 24 Online
» 1221 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 7610 Week
» 28052 Month
» 364898 Year
» 1586463 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 841 m/e 12/1919
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1401   12/10/1946
British Railways (Orig) 61401   20/12/1948
British Railways 61470 w/e 17/12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer V. Raven
Class B16
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 12/1919 to Heaton (HTN)
Withdrawal Mon 23/11/1959 off Neville Hill (50B)
Scrapping During 01/1960 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)
Service Life 39 yrs, 11 mths , 24 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Darlington

Allocations
Code Name From Date
HTN Heaton (New) m/e 12/1919
HLD Hull Dairycoates on 27/11/1930
YK York (North) on 28/03/1943
NEV Neville Hill on 07/08/1949
   Withdrawn on 23/11/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC NEV Neville Hill w/e 13/08/1949
WDN   on 23/11/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1919 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1008)
07/07/1933 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2268)
26/05/1936 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1577)
13/12/1938 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2559)
01/08/1941 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2557)
05/07/1944 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3452)
05/07/1947 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3423)
09/12/1950 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24010)
26/09/1953 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24003)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gateshead Works 29/03/1923 13/06/1923 77 days General  
Gateshead Works 21/01/1926 10/06/1926 141 days General  
Gateshead Works 08/03/1927 17/03/1927 10 days Light Repair  
Gateshead Works 28/03/1928 28/04/1928 32 days Light Repair  
Gateshead Works 27/08/1929 05/11/1929 71 days General  
Gateshead Works 20/11/1929 23/11/1929 4 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 24/05/1933 07/07/1933 45 days General
Boiler number 2268 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 15/04/1936 26/05/1936 42 days General
Boiler number D1577 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 27/10/1938 13/12/1938 48 days General
Boiler number 2559 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 14/12/1938 23/12/1938 10 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 09/06/1941 01/08/1941 54 days General
Boiler number 2557 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 06/06/1944 05/07/1944 30 days General
Boiler number 3452 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 20/05/1947 05/07/1947 47 days General
Boiler number 3423 (Diagram 49A)
 
Gateshead Works 02/12/1948 20/12/1948 19 days Light Repair
Renumbered to BR (Orig) number 61401
 
Darlington Works 08/11/1950 09/12/1950 32 days General
Boiler number 24010 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 02/09/1953 26/09/1953 25 days General
Boiler number 24003 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 24/09/1954 06/11/1954 44 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 23/03/1956 23/04/1956 32 days Heavy Intermediate  
Darlington Works 22/05/1956 24/05/1956 3 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 21/06/1956 26/06/1956 6 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 25/09/1956 12/10/1956 18 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 02/03/1959 13/03/1959 12 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 13/11/1959 13/11/1959 1 day No repairs  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
21/08/1954 Q1 on passenger train! On Saturday 21/8/54 the unusual event occurred of a Q1 0-8-0T hauling a passenger train, albeit for a short distance. On this date B16/1 61470 (50B) failed with a blown middle cylinder cover between Gascoigne Woad and Hagg Lane whilst working the 9.45 a.m. passenger train from Leeds City to Hull. 69933 (50C), one of the Gascoigne Wood hump pilots, was requisitioned to haul the disabled engine and train into Selby, where 61470 was removed by 69933 to the shed and the train worked forward by J39 64947 (50F). SLS/195410

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1919 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 841
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Heaton (HTN)
Diagram 49 boiler fitted
   
29/03/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1923. Dep: 13/06/1923.    
21/01/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 21/01/1926. Dep: 10/06/1926.    
08/03/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/03/1927. Dep: 17/03/1927.    
28/03/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/03/1928. Dep: 28/04/1928.    
27/08/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 27/08/1929. Dep: 05/11/1929.    
20/11/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/11/1929. Dep: 23/11/1929.    
27/11/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
24/05/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/05/1933. Dep: 07/07/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2268 (Diagram 49)
   
15/04/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/04/1936. Dep: 26/05/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1577 (Diagram 49)
   
27/10/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1938. Dep: 13/12/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2559 (Diagram 49)
   
14/12/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/12/1938. Dep: 23/12/1938.    
09/06/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1941. Dep: 01/08/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2557 (Diagram 49)
   
28/03/1943 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
06/06/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1944. Dep: 05/07/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3452 (Diagram 49A)
   
12/10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1401    
20/05/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/05/1947. Dep: 05/07/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3423 (Diagram 49A)
   
02/12/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/12/1948. Dep: 20/12/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR (Orig) number 61401
   
07/08/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV)    
17/12/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61470    
08/11/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/11/1950. Dep: 09/12/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24010 (Diagram 49A)
   
02/09/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/09/1953. Dep: 26/09/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24003 (Diagram 49A)
   
24/09/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/09/1954. Dep: 06/11/1954.    
23/03/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 23/03/1956. Dep: 23/04/1956.    
22/05/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/05/1956. Dep: 24/05/1956.    
21/06/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/06/1956. Dep: 26/06/1956.    
25/09/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/09/1956. Dep: 12/10/1956.    
02/03/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/03/1959. Dep: 13/03/1959.    
13/11/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 13/11/1959. Dep: 13/11/1959.    
23/11/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 61470 from Neville Hill (50B)    

prev prev