Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 196 Today
» 1085 Yesterday
» 196 Week
» 22702 Month
» 325892 Year
» 1547457 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 842 m/e 12/1919
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1402   24/11/1946
British Railways (Orig) 61402   01/10/1948
British Railways 61471 w/e 17/12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer V. Raven
Class B16
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 12/1919 to Heaton (HTN)
Withdrawal Mon 05/09/1960 off Neville Hill (55H)
Scrapping During 09/1960 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)
Service Life 40 yrs, 9 mths , 6 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Darlington

Allocations
Code Name From Date
HTN Heaton (New) m/e 12/1919
HLD Hull Dairycoates on 27/11/1930
YK York (North) on 28/03/1943
SKN Stockton on 06/05/1946
YK York (North) on 31/08/1947
NEV Neville Hill on 07/08/1949
   Withdrawn on 05/09/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC YK York (North) on 31/08/1947
ALLOC NEV Neville Hill w/e 13/08/1949
WDN   on 05/09/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1919 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1012)
03/12/1929 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1149)
20/01/1933 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1587)
27/12/1935 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2728)
26/11/1938 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1634)
07/05/1941 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1667)
18/06/1943 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1610)
22/09/1945 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2881)
01/10/1948 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2266)
27/09/1951 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 24026)
18/06/1954 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 24043)
15/03/1957 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24023)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gateshead Works 07/07/1922 08/12/1922 155 days General  
Gateshead Works 17/09/1926 26/02/1926 -202 days General  
Gateshead Works 17/05/1927 02/07/1927 47 days Light Repair  
Gateshead Works 02/03/1928 02/04/1928 32 days Light Repair  
Gateshead Works 28/09/1928 07/12/1928 71 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 24/09/1929 03/12/1929 71 days General
Boiler number D1149 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 01/12/1932 20/01/1933 51 days General
Boiler number D1587 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 06/11/1933 16/03/1934 131 days Heavy  
Darlington Works 05/11/1935 27/12/1935 53 days General
Boiler number 2728 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 02/01/1936 09/01/1936 8 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 30/09/1938 26/11/1938 58 days General
Boiler number D1634 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 03/04/1941 07/05/1941 35 days General
Boiler number D1667 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 08/05/1943 18/06/1943 42 days General
Boiler number D1610 (Diagram 49)
 
Gateshead Works 15/11/1944 01/12/1944 17 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 21/08/1945 22/09/1945 33 days General
Boiler number 2881 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 15/01/1946 01/02/1946 18 days Light Repair  
Gateshead Works 19/02/1947 07/03/1947 17 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 03/09/1948 01/10/1948 29 days General
Boiler number 2266 (Diagram 49)
Renumbered to BR (Orig) number 61402
 
Darlington Works 30/08/1951 27/09/1951 29 days General
Boiler number 24026 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 20/05/1954 18/06/1954 30 days General
Boiler number 24043 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 18/02/1957 15/03/1957 26 days General
Boiler number 24023 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 18/03/1957 19/03/1957 2 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 01/09/1960 01/09/1960 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1919 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 842
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Heaton (HTN)
Diagram 49 boiler fitted
   
07/07/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1922. Dep: 08/12/1922.    
17/09/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 17/09/1926. Dep: 26/02/1926.    
17/05/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/05/1927. Dep: 02/07/1927.    
02/03/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/03/1928. Dep: 02/04/1928.    
28/09/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/09/1928. Dep: 07/12/1928.    
24/09/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/09/1929. Dep: 03/12/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1149 (Diagram 49)
   
27/11/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
01/12/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1932. Dep: 20/01/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1587 (Diagram 49)
   
06/11/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 06/11/1933. Dep: 16/03/1934.    
05/11/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1935. Dep: 27/12/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2728 (Diagram 49)
   
02/01/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/01/1936. Dep: 09/01/1936.    
30/09/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/09/1938. Dep: 26/11/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1634 (Diagram 49)
   
03/04/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/04/1941. Dep: 07/05/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1667 (Diagram 49)
   
28/03/1943 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
08/05/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/05/1943. Dep: 18/06/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1610 (Diagram 49)
   
15/11/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/11/1944. Dep: 01/12/1944.    
21/08/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/08/1945. Dep: 22/09/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2881 (Diagram 49)
   
15/01/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/01/1946. Dep: 01/02/1946.    
06/05/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Stockton (SKN)    
24/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1402    
19/02/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/02/1947. Dep: 07/03/1947.    
31/08/1947 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
03/09/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/09/1948. Dep: 01/10/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2266 (Diagram 49)
Renumbered to BR (Orig) number 61402
   
07/08/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV)    
17/12/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61471    
30/08/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/08/1951. Dep: 27/09/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24026 (Diagram 49)
   
20/05/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/05/1954. Dep: 18/06/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24043 (Diagram 49)
   
18/02/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1957. Dep: 15/03/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24023 (Diagram 49A)
   
18/03/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/03/1957. Dep: 19/03/1957.    
01/09/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 01/09/1960. Dep: 01/09/1960.    
05/09/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 61471 from Neville Hill (55H)    

prev prev