|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 27/11/1922 | 05/03/1923 | 99 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 11/08/1926 | 09/03/1927 | 211 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 10/06/1929 | 11/09/1929 | 94 days | General | Boiler number D1036 (Diagram 49) |
||
Gateshead Works | 16/09/1931 | 25/09/1931 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 05/02/1932 | 21/03/1932 | 46 days | General | Boiler number D976 (Diagram 49) |
||
Gateshead Works | 12/08/1932 | 23/08/1932 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 20/09/1933 | 28/11/1933 | 70 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 15/10/1934 | 09/01/1935 | 87 days | General | Boiler number D1551 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/05/1937 | 11/06/1937 | 40 days | General | Boiler number D1614 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/05/1940 | 13/06/1940 | 30 days | General | Boiler number D1450 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 28/12/1942 | 30/01/1943 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 2881 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/06/1945 | 08/09/1945 | 100 days | General | Rebuilt to class B16/3 Boiler number 3578 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/01/1946 | 28/01/1946 | 26 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 17/09/1946 | 07/10/1946 | 21 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 18/10/1947 | 28/11/1947 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 3576 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/10/1950 | 03/11/1950 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 24005 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/02/1953 | 14/03/1953 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 24002 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/03/1953 | 18/03/1953 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 06/04/1955 | 07/05/1955 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 24066 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/05/1957 | 22/06/1957 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 24012 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/07/1957 | 10/07/1957 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 28/04/1958 | 02/05/1958 | 5 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 27/11/1958 | 02/01/1959 | 37 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 19/08/1959 | 20/08/1959 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 16/11/1959 | 26/11/1959 | 11 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 12/04/1960 | 20/05/1960 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 24066 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/02/1963 | 15/03/1963 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 24102 (Diagram 49A) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1919 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 843 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Heaton (HTN) Diagram 49 boiler fitted |
||
27/11/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 27/11/1922. Dep: 05/03/1923. | ||
11/08/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1926. Dep: 09/03/1927. | ||
10/06/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 10/06/1929. Dep: 11/09/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1036 (Diagram 49) |
||
16/09/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/09/1931. Dep: 25/09/1931. | ||
05/02/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1932. Dep: 21/03/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number D976 (Diagram 49) |
||
12/08/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/08/1932. Dep: 23/08/1932. | ||
20/09/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/09/1933. Dep: 28/11/1933. | ||
15/10/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/10/1934. Dep: 09/01/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1551 (Diagram 49) |
||
18/10/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
03/05/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1937. Dep: 11/06/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1614 (Diagram 49) |
||
15/05/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/05/1940. Dep: 13/06/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1450 (Diagram 49) |
||
01/06/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
07/11/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
28/12/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/12/1942. Dep: 30/01/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2881 (Diagram 49) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
01/06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/06/1945. Dep: 08/09/1945. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class B16/3 Boiler number 3578 (Diagram 49A) |
||
03/01/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/01/1946. Dep: 28/01/1946. | ||
26/05/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1403 | ||
17/09/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/09/1946. Dep: 07/10/1946. | ||
18/10/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1947. Dep: 28/11/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3576 (Diagram 49A) |
||
1948 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 61403 but not taken up | ||
13/12/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 61472 | ||
06/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/10/1950. Dep: 03/11/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24005 (Diagram 49A) |
||
11/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/02/1953. Dep: 14/03/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24002 (Diagram 49A) |
||
16/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/03/1953. Dep: 18/03/1953. | ||
06/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/04/1955. Dep: 07/05/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24066 (Diagram 49A) |
||
27/05/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1957. Dep: 22/06/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24012 (Diagram 49A) |
||
04/07/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/07/1957. Dep: 10/07/1957. | ||
28/04/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/04/1958. Dep: 02/05/1958. | ||
27/11/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/11/1958. Dep: 02/01/1959. | ||
19/08/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/08/1959. Dep: 20/08/1959. | ||
16/11/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/11/1959. Dep: 26/11/1959. | ||
12/04/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1960. Dep: 20/05/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24066 (Diagram 49A) |
||
02/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B) | ||
08/02/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/02/1963. Dep: 15/03/1963. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24102 (Diagram 49A) |
||
20/04/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61472 from Hull Dairycoates (50B) | ||
09/11/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Drapers: Hull |