Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 1027 Today
» 1282 Yesterday
» 7417 Week
» 36915 Month
» 373761 Year
» 1595326 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 843 m/e 12/1919
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1403   26/05/1946
British Railways (Orig) 61403   Not applied
British Railways 61472   13/12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer V. Raven
Class B16
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B16/112/1919
B16/308/09/1945
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 12/1919 to Heaton (HTN)
Withdrawal Mon 20/04/1964 off Hull Dairycoates (50B)
Scrapping Mon 09/11/1964 at Drapers (Hull)
Service Life 44 yrs, 4 mths , 21 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to A. Draper, Hull, 9/64. Cut up 9/11/64

Allocations
Code Name From Date
HTN Heaton (New) m/e 12/1919
HLD Hull Dairycoates on 18/10/1934
YK York (North) on 01/06/1940
NEV Neville Hill on 07/11/1940
YK York (North) on 28/03/1943
50B Hull Dairycoates on 02/12/1962
   Withdrawn on 20/04/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 50B Hull Dairycoates w/e 08/12/1962
WDN   on 20/04/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1919 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1015)
11/09/1929 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1036)
21/03/1932 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D976)
09/01/1935 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1551)
11/06/1937 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1614)
13/06/1940 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1450)
30/01/1943 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2881)
08/09/1945 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3578)
28/11/1947 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3576)
03/11/1950 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24005)
14/03/1953 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24002)
07/05/1955 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24066)
22/06/1957 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24012)
20/05/1960 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24066)
15/03/1963 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24102)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gateshead Works 27/11/1922 05/03/1923 99 days General  
Darlington Works 11/08/1926 09/03/1927 211 days General  
Gateshead Works 10/06/1929 11/09/1929 94 days General
Boiler number D1036 (Diagram 49)
 
Gateshead Works 16/09/1931 25/09/1931 10 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 05/02/1932 21/03/1932 46 days General
Boiler number D976 (Diagram 49)
 
Gateshead Works 12/08/1932 23/08/1932 12 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 20/09/1933 28/11/1933 70 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 15/10/1934 09/01/1935 87 days General
Boiler number D1551 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 03/05/1937 11/06/1937 40 days General
Boiler number D1614 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 15/05/1940 13/06/1940 30 days General
Boiler number D1450 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 28/12/1942 30/01/1943 34 days General
Boiler number 2881 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 01/06/1945 08/09/1945 100 days General
Rebuilt to class B16/3
Boiler number 3578 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 03/01/1946 28/01/1946 26 days Light Repair  
Gateshead Works 17/09/1946 07/10/1946 21 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 18/10/1947 28/11/1947 42 days General
Boiler number 3576 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 06/10/1950 03/11/1950 29 days General
Boiler number 24005 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 11/02/1953 14/03/1953 32 days General
Boiler number 24002 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 16/03/1953 18/03/1953 3 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 06/04/1955 07/05/1955 32 days General
Boiler number 24066 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 27/05/1957 22/06/1957 27 days General
Boiler number 24012 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 04/07/1957 10/07/1957 7 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 28/04/1958 02/05/1958 5 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 27/11/1958 02/01/1959 37 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 19/08/1959 20/08/1959 2 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 16/11/1959 26/11/1959 11 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 12/04/1960 20/05/1960 39 days General
Boiler number 24066 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 08/02/1963 15/03/1963 36 days General
Boiler number 24102 (Diagram 49A)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1919 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 843
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Heaton (HTN)
Diagram 49 boiler fitted
   
27/11/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 27/11/1922. Dep: 05/03/1923.    
11/08/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1926. Dep: 09/03/1927.    
10/06/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 10/06/1929. Dep: 11/09/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1036 (Diagram 49)
   
16/09/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/09/1931. Dep: 25/09/1931.    
05/02/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1932. Dep: 21/03/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D976 (Diagram 49)
   
12/08/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/08/1932. Dep: 23/08/1932.    
20/09/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/09/1933. Dep: 28/11/1933.    
15/10/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/10/1934. Dep: 09/01/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1551 (Diagram 49)
   
18/10/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
03/05/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1937. Dep: 11/06/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1614 (Diagram 49)
   
15/05/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/05/1940. Dep: 13/06/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1450 (Diagram 49)
   
01/06/1940 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
07/11/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV)    
28/12/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/12/1942. Dep: 30/01/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2881 (Diagram 49)
   
28/03/1943 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
01/06/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/06/1945. Dep: 08/09/1945.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class B16/3
Boiler number 3578 (Diagram 49A)
   
03/01/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/01/1946. Dep: 28/01/1946.    
26/05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1403    
17/09/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/09/1946. Dep: 07/10/1946.    
18/10/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1947. Dep: 28/11/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3576 (Diagram 49A)
   
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 61403 but not taken up    
13/12/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61472    
06/10/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/10/1950. Dep: 03/11/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24005 (Diagram 49A)
   
11/02/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/02/1953. Dep: 14/03/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24002 (Diagram 49A)
   
16/03/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/03/1953. Dep: 18/03/1953.    
06/04/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/04/1955. Dep: 07/05/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24066 (Diagram 49A)
   
27/05/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1957. Dep: 22/06/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24012 (Diagram 49A)
   
04/07/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/07/1957. Dep: 10/07/1957.    
28/04/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/04/1958. Dep: 02/05/1958.    
27/11/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/11/1958. Dep: 02/01/1959.    
19/08/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/08/1959. Dep: 20/08/1959.    
16/11/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/11/1959. Dep: 26/11/1959.    
12/04/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1960. Dep: 20/05/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24066 (Diagram 49A)
   
02/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B)    
08/02/1963 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/02/1963. Dep: 15/03/1963.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24102 (Diagram 49A)
   
20/04/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 61472 from Hull Dairycoates (50B)    

prev prev