Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 161 Today
» 1085 Yesterday
» 161 Week
» 22667 Month
» 325857 Year
» 1547422 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 844 m/e 12/1919
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1404   25/06/1946
British Railways (Orig) 61404   12/10/1948
British Railways 61473 w/e 24/12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer V. Raven
Class B16
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 12/1919 to York (North) (YK)
Withdrawal Mon 25/09/1961 off York (North) (50A)
Scrapping During 11/1961 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)
Service Life 41 yrs, 9 mths , 26 dys

Notes
Notes Into Darlington for cutting up 15/11/61

Allocations
Code Name From Date
YK York (North) (New) m/e 12/1919
HLD Hull Dairycoates on 11/09/1949
YK York (North) on 04/12/1949
50B Neville Hill on 06/05/1951
50A York (North) on 15/11/1953
50B Neville Hill on 14/03/1954
50A York (North) on 18/07/1954
   Withdrawn on 25/09/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC HLD Hull Dairycoates w/e 17/09/1949
ALLOC YK York (North) w/e 10/12/1949
ALLOC 50B Neville Hill w/e 12/05/1951
ALLOC 50A York (North) 4w/e 28/11/1953
ALLOC 50B Neville Hill 4w/e 27/03/1954
ALLOC 50A York (North) 4w/e 14/08/1954
WDN   on 25/09/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1919 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1021)
23/09/1930 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1461)
15/11/1933 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1117)
06/02/1936 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2557)
29/03/1938 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1587)
24/01/1941 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1221)
24/06/1944 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3166)
01/09/1951 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24028)
10/02/1955 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24047)
31/10/1958 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24072)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 16/05/1923 04/08/1923 81 days General  
Darlington Works 05/02/1924 04/04/1924 60 days General  
Darlington Works 07/07/1925 11/08/1925 36 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 31/01/1927 08/10/1927 251 days General  
Darlington Works 23/06/1930 23/09/1930 93 days General
Boiler number D1461 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 23/05/1932 01/06/1932 10 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 05/10/1933 15/11/1933 42 days General
Boiler number D1117 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 05/12/1935 06/02/1936 64 days General
Boiler number 2557 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 11/02/1938 29/03/1938 47 days General  
Darlington Works 29/03/1938 08/04/1938 11 days Unclassified
Boiler number D1587 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 26/12/1940 24/01/1941 30 days General
Boiler number D1221 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 25/05/1944 24/06/1944 31 days General
Boiler number 3166 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 03/01/1947 19/04/1947 107 days Heavy  
Gateshead Works 28/09/1948 12/10/1948 15 days Light Repair
Renumbered to BR (Orig) number 61404
 
Darlington Works 13/07/1951 01/09/1951 51 days General
Boiler number 24028 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 22/04/1952 15/05/1952 24 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 18/06/1953 15/07/1953 28 days Heavy Casual  
Darlington Works 13/01/1955 10/02/1955 29 days General
Boiler number 24047 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 24/10/1956 07/05/1957 196 days Heavy Casual  
Darlington Works 29/09/1958 31/10/1958 33 days General
Boiler number 24072 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 25/08/1959 04/11/1959 72 days Heavy Casual  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1919 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 844
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to York (North) (YK)
Diagram 49 boiler fitted
   
16/05/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/05/1923. Dep: 04/08/1923.    
05/02/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1924. Dep: 04/04/1924.    
07/07/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/07/1925. Dep: 11/08/1925.    
31/01/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1927. Dep: 08/10/1927.    
23/06/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1930. Dep: 23/09/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1461 (Diagram 49)
   
23/05/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/05/1932. Dep: 01/06/1932.    
05/10/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1933. Dep: 15/11/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1117 (Diagram 49)
   
05/12/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/12/1935. Dep: 06/02/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2557 (Diagram 49)
   
11/02/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/02/1938. Dep: 29/03/1938.    
29/03/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/03/1938. Dep: 08/04/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1587 (Diagram 49)
   
26/12/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/12/1940. Dep: 24/01/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1221 (Diagram 49)
   
25/05/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/05/1944. Dep: 24/06/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3166 (Diagram 49A)
   
25/06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1404    
03/01/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 03/01/1947. Dep: 19/04/1947.    
28/09/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/09/1948. Dep: 12/10/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR (Orig) number 61404
   
11/09/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
04/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
24/12/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61473    
06/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B)    
13/07/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/07/1951. Dep: 01/09/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24028 (Diagram 49A)
   
22/04/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/04/1952. Dep: 15/05/1952.    
18/06/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 18/06/1953. Dep: 15/07/1953.    
15/11/1953 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
14/03/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B)    
18/07/1954 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
13/01/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1955. Dep: 10/02/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24047 (Diagram 49A)
   
24/10/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 24/10/1956. Dep: 07/05/1957.    
29/09/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1958. Dep: 31/10/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24072 (Diagram 49A)
   
25/08/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 25/08/1959. Dep: 04/11/1959.    
25/09/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 61473 from York (North) (50A)    

prev prev