Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 127 Today
» 1352 Yesterday
» 7868 Week
» 28310 Month
» 365156 Year
» 1586721 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 845 m/e 04/1920
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1405   26/10/1946
British Railways (Orig) 61405   18/05/1949
British Railways 61474 w/e 24/12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer V. Raven
Class B16
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 04/1920 to York (North) (YK)
Withdrawal Mon 20/01/1958 off Selby (50C)
Scrapping During 03/1958 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)
Service Life 37 yrs, 9 mths , 20 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Darlington

Allocations
Code Name From Date
YK York (North) (New) m/e 04/1920
SCA Scarborough on 15/07/1924
YK York (North) on 01/10/1924
SCA Scarborough on 14/01/1930
YK York (North) on 28/03/1943
50B Neville Hill on 06/05/1951
50A York (North) on 15/11/1953
50B Neville Hill on 14/03/1954
50A York (North) on 18/07/1954
50C Selby on 29/05/1955
   Withdrawn on 20/01/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 50B Neville Hill w/e 12/05/1951
ALLOC 50A York (North) 4w/e 28/11/1953
ALLOC 50B Neville Hill 4w/e 27/03/1954
ALLOC 50A York (North) 4w/e 14/08/1954
ALLOC 50C Selby 4w/e 18/06/1955
WDN   on 21/01/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1920 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1029)
07/08/1928 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1492)
21/04/1934 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1465)
18/07/1936 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2559)
02/12/1938 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2264)
31/01/1941 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1535)
22/01/1944 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2718)
30/11/1946 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2558)
18/05/1949 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3942)
01/11/1952 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24073)
07/05/1955 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 24057)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 28/10/1922 28/02/1923 124 days General  
Darlington Works 06/04/1925 18/08/1925 135 days General  
Darlington Works 25/04/1928 07/05/1928 13 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 21/05/1928 07/08/1928 79 days General
Boiler number D1492 (Diagram 49)
 
Gateshead Works 07/03/1929 28/03/1929 22 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 29/10/1931 11/12/1931 44 days General  
Darlington Works 17/03/1934 21/04/1934 36 days General
Boiler number D1465 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 03/06/1936 18/07/1936 46 days General
Boiler number 2559 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 29/09/1938 02/12/1938 65 days General
Boiler number 2264 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 26/12/1940 31/01/1941 37 days General
Boiler number D1535 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 24/12/1943 22/01/1944 30 days General
Boiler number 2718 (Diagram 49)
 
Gateshead Works 17/08/1945 07/09/1945 22 days General  
Darlington Works 18/10/1946 30/11/1946 44 days General
Boiler number 2558 (Diagram 49)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 1405
 
Darlington Works 07/12/1946 12/12/1946 6 days Unclassified  
Gateshead Works 22/12/1947 15/01/1948 25 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 16/04/1949 18/05/1949 33 days General
Boiler number 3942 (Diagram 49A)
Renumbered to BR (Orig) number 61405
 
Darlington Works 09/10/1952 01/11/1952 24 days General
Boiler number 24073 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 03/11/1952 14/11/1952 12 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 28/11/1952 03/12/1952 6 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 10/12/1952 30/12/1952 21 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 12/04/1955 07/05/1955 26 days General
Boiler number 24057 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 09/05/1955 14/05/1955 6 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 09/01/1958 09/01/1958 1 day No repairs  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/04/1949 Darlington Works New work April: Nos. 60146 an 60147. Locomotives awaiting Works during April included: Nos. 888, 1035, 61199, 1224, 1405, 61625, 1668, 2726, 62753. 2760, 3044, 3260, 3275, 63286, 5044/68, 5109, 65633/50, 5653, 65684, 5858, 65868, 7278, 7675, 67729 (light re-pair), 67739 (damaged), 8156, 69842, Class '8' W.D. 77037, 77178 an 79206. Broken up: Nos. 63286, 3316, 65633/84.
Locomotives ex Works during April included: Nos. 60816, 61023, 61215/40/57, 61422, 61434 (rebuilt), 61648, 62700/03/64/67, 63348/80/92, 63411, 65110, 65739, 65821/44, 67722 (light repair), 68015/27, 68409/14/32, 68705, 69107, 69391, 69835/36/88, Class '8' W.D. 90382, 90449 (light repair) and 90460.
SLS/194906

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1920 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 845
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to York (North) (YK)
Diagram 49 boiler fitted
   
28/10/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1922. Dep: 28/02/1923.    
15/07/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Scarborough (SCA)    
01/10/1924 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
06/04/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/04/1925. Dep: 18/08/1925.    
25/04/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/04/1928. Dep: 07/05/1928.    
21/05/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/05/1928. Dep: 07/08/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1492 (Diagram 49)
   
07/03/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/03/1929. Dep: 28/03/1929.    
14/01/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Scarborough (SCA)    
29/10/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/10/1931. Dep: 11/12/1931.    
17/03/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1934. Dep: 21/04/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1465 (Diagram 49)
   
03/06/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/06/1936. Dep: 18/07/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2559 (Diagram 49)
   
29/09/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1938. Dep: 02/12/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2264 (Diagram 49)
   
26/12/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/12/1940. Dep: 31/01/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1535 (Diagram 49)
   
28/03/1943 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
24/12/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/12/1943. Dep: 22/01/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2718 (Diagram 49)
   
17/08/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1945. Dep: 07/09/1945.    
18/10/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1946. Dep: 30/11/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2558 (Diagram 49)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 1405
   
07/12/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/12/1946. Dep: 12/12/1946.    
22/12/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/12/1947. Dep: 15/01/1948.    
16/04/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/04/1949. Dep: 18/05/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3942 (Diagram 49A)
Renumbered to BR (Orig) number 61405
   
24/12/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61474    
06/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B)    
09/10/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/10/1952. Dep: 01/11/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24073 (Diagram 49A)
   
03/11/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/11/1952. Dep: 14/11/1952.    
28/11/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/11/1952. Dep: 03/12/1952.    
10/12/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/12/1952. Dep: 30/12/1952.    
15/11/1953 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
14/03/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B)    
18/07/1954 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
12/04/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1955. Dep: 07/05/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24057 (Diagram 49)
   
09/05/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/05/1955. Dep: 14/05/1955.    
29/05/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Selby (50C)    
09/01/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 09/01/1958. Dep: 09/01/1958.    
20/01/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 61474 from Selby (50C)    

prev prev