Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 740 Today
» 1015 Yesterday
» 4908 Week
» 20022 Month
» 323212 Year
» 1544777 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 908 m/e 08/1920
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1411   12/10/1946
British Railways 61411   23/03/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer V. Raven
Class B16
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 08/1920 to York (North) (YK)
Withdrawal Mon 25/09/1961 off Mirfield (56D)
Scrapping During 11/1962 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)
Service Life 41 yrs, 1 mth , 25 dys

Notes
Notes Into Darlington for cutting up 4/10/61

Allocations
Code Name From Date
YK York (North) (New) m/e 08/1920
SCA Scarborough on 03/10/1929
YK York (North) on 02/11/1929
NEV Neville Hill on 07/08/1949
56D Mirfield on 11/12/1960
   Withdrawn on 25/09/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC NEV Neville Hill w/e 13/08/1949
ALLOC 50B Neville Hill 4w/e 23/06/1956
ALLOC 56D Mirfield on 17/12/1960
WDN   on 25/09/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1920 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1113)
23/12/1930 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1038)
26/01/1934 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2265)
11/11/1936 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1667)
22/04/1939 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2267)
27/12/1941 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2878)
04/03/1944 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3439)
12/10/1946 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3427)
21/04/1951 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 24008)
10/12/1953 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24084)
28/01/1960 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24044)


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
17/12/1960 Mirfield MPD From 17th Dec., six B16s have been allocated for freight duties, viz.' 61411-4/6/47;, during 1959, several were on loan to this shed while the 4 Mirfield B1s were in shops. SLS/196102

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1920 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 908
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to York (North) (YK)
Diagram 49 boiler fitted
   
03/10/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Scarborough (SCA)    
02/11/1929 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
23/12/1930 Modification Diagram 49 number D1038 boiler fitted    
26/01/1934 Modification Diagram 49 number 2265 boiler fitted    
11/11/1936 Modification Diagram 49 number D1667 boiler fitted    
22/04/1939 Modification Diagram 49 number 2267 boiler fitted    
27/12/1941 Modification Diagram 49 number 2878 boiler fitted    
04/03/1944 Modification Diagram 49A number 3439 boiler fitted    
12/10/1946 Modification Diagram 49A number 3427 boiler fitted    
12/10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1411    
07/08/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV)    
23/03/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 61411    
21/04/1951 Modification Diagram 49 number 24008 boiler fitted    
10/12/1953 Modification Diagram 49A number 24084 boiler fitted    
28/01/1960 Modification Diagram 49A number 24044 boiler fitted    
11/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Mirfield (56D)    
25/09/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 61411 from Mirfield (56D)    

prev prev