Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 1311 Today
» 1371 Yesterday
» 5271 Week
» 34857 Month
» 408870 Year
» 1630435 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 909 m/e 08/1920
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1412   16/06/1946
British Railways (Interim) E1412   25/03/1948
British Railways 61412   10/06/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer V. Raven
Class B16
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 08/1920 to Tweedmouth (TWD)
Withdrawal Mon 25/09/1961 off Mirfield (56D)
Scrapping During 11/1963 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)
Service Life 41 yrs, 1 mth , 25 dys

Notes
Notes Into Darlington for cutting up 11/10/61

Allocations
Code Name From Date
TWD Tweedmouth (New) m/e 08/1920
HLD Hull Dairycoates on 30/08/1929
YK York (North) on 28/03/1943
NEV Neville Hill on 07/08/1949
56D Mirfield on 11/12/1960
   Withdrawn on 25/09/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC NEV Neville Hill w/e 13/08/1949
WDN   m/e 30/06/1960
ALLOC 56D Mirfield on 17/12/1960
WDN   on 25/09/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1920 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1116)
03/05/1932 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1582)
20/07/1934 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1559)
10/05/1937 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1184)
11/05/1940 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1141)
31/03/1943 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3165)
01/06/1946 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3276)
10/06/1950 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3025)
23/05/1956 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24104)
02/02/1960 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24031)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gateshead Works 21/03/1923 28/05/1923 69 days General  
Gateshead Works 15/09/1925 27/11/1925 74 days General
Shorter chimney fitted
 
Gateshead Works 14/02/1927 01/06/1927 108 days General  
Gateshead Works 04/08/1927 10/08/1927 7 days Light Repair  
Gateshead Works 09/04/1929 21/06/1929 74 days General  
Darlington Works 18/03/1932 03/05/1932 47 days General
Boiler number D1582 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 06/06/1934 20/07/1934 45 days General
Boiler number D1559 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 07/04/1937 10/05/1937 34 days General
Boiler number D1184 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 11/05/1937 14/05/1937 4 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 17/04/1940 11/05/1940 25 days General
Boiler number D1141 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 17/02/1943 31/03/1943 43 days General
Boiler number 3165 (Diagram 49A)
 
Gateshead Works 12/10/1944 02/11/1944 22 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 08/05/1946 01/06/1946 25 days General
Boiler number 3276 (Diagram 49A)
 
Gateshead Works 20/01/1947 15/02/1947 27 days Light Repair
After collision
 
Gateshead Works 03/03/1948 25/03/1948 23 days Light Repair
Renumbered to BR (Interim) number E1412
 
Darlington Works 11/05/1950 10/06/1950 31 days General
Boiler number 24086 (Diagram 49A)
Renumbered to BR 61412
 
Darlington Works 10/07/1950 22/08/1950 44 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 11/09/1953 10/10/1953 30 days Light Intermediate  
Darlington Works 27/11/1954 29/12/1954 33 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 13/04/1956 23/05/1956 41 days General
Boiler number 24104 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 30/05/1956 01/06/1956 3 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 01/10/1956 19/10/1956 19 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 24/11/1959 02/02/1960 71 days General
Boiler number 24031 (Diagram 49A)
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
15/03/1947 Newbury Racecourse Dump Engines stored 15th March, 1947. 'Austerity' 0-6-0 saddle tank W.D. 75092, Hudswell Clarke 1753/43; and thirty-three of the U.S.A. pattern 0 6 0 side tank: 1252/3/4/6/8/9, 1261/6 H. K. Porter & Co. 7408/9, 7410/2/4/5/7, 7422 (1942). 1279/80/82 Vulcan Iron Works, Wilkes-Barre 4377/78/80 (1942), 1387/90/93/98, 1400/3/4/7/8/11/12/25/28/29 H. K. Porter & Co. 7501/4/7/12 (1942) 7514/7/8/21/2/5/6 (? 1943) 7539/42/43 (1943), 1938/40/44 Davenport Loco. Wks. 2503/5/9 (3/1943). 1959/68/91 Vulcan Iron Wks. 4432/41/44 (2/43, 3/43, 3/43). 4372, 6006 Davenport Loco. Wks. 2521 (4/43) & 2595 (1/44). All the Vulcan lot except 1280 were marked for the Southern Ry. Although all had their original U.S.A. numbers, all except eleven (1252, 1390/3/8, 1400/4/11/29, 1944/68, 4372) carried W.D. prefix. The dates were not shown on the Porter engines. (With regard to the numbering, two of this class when at Longmoor were given numbers in the W.D. series, 75215 (1954) and 75217 (1958) for a short time only). SLS/194705
17/12/1960 Mirfield MPD From 17th Dec., six B16s have been allocated for freight duties, viz.' 61411-4/6/47;, during 1959, several were on loan to this shed while the 4 Mirfield B1s were in shops. SLS/196102

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1920 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 909
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Tweedmouth (TWD)
Diagram 49 boiler fitted
   
30/08/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
28/03/1943 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
16/06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1412    
07/08/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV)    
11/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Mirfield (56D)    
25/09/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 61412 from Mirfield (56D)    

prev prev