|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 21/03/1923 | 28/05/1923 | 69 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 15/09/1925 | 27/11/1925 | 74 days | General | Shorter chimney fitted |
||
Gateshead Works | 14/02/1927 | 01/06/1927 | 108 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 04/08/1927 | 10/08/1927 | 7 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 09/04/1929 | 21/06/1929 | 74 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 18/03/1932 | 03/05/1932 | 47 days | General | Boiler number D1582 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/06/1934 | 20/07/1934 | 45 days | General | Boiler number D1559 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/04/1937 | 10/05/1937 | 34 days | General | Boiler number D1184 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/05/1937 | 14/05/1937 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 17/04/1940 | 11/05/1940 | 25 days | General | Boiler number D1141 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/02/1943 | 31/03/1943 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 3165 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 12/10/1944 | 02/11/1944 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 08/05/1946 | 01/06/1946 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 3276 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 20/01/1947 | 15/02/1947 | 27 days | Light Repair | After collision |
||
Gateshead Works | 03/03/1948 | 25/03/1948 | 23 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR (Interim) number E1412 |
||
Darlington Works | 11/05/1950 | 10/06/1950 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 24086 (Diagram 49A) Renumbered to BR 61412 |
||
Darlington Works | 10/07/1950 | 22/08/1950 | 44 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 11/09/1953 | 10/10/1953 | 30 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 27/11/1954 | 29/12/1954 | 33 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 13/04/1956 | 23/05/1956 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 24104 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 30/05/1956 | 01/06/1956 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 01/10/1956 | 19/10/1956 | 19 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 24/11/1959 | 02/02/1960 | 71 days | General | Boiler number 24031 (Diagram 49A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
15/03/1947 | Newbury Racecourse Dump | Engines stored 15th March, 1947. 'Austerity' 0-6-0 saddle tank W.D. 75092, Hudswell Clarke 1753/43; and thirty-three of the U.S.A. pattern 0 6 0 side tank: 1252/3/4/6/8/9, 1261/6 H. K. Porter & Co. 7408/9, 7410/2/4/5/7, 7422 (1942). 1279/80/82 Vulcan Iron Works, Wilkes-Barre 4377/78/80 (1942), 1387/90/93/98, 1400/3/4/7/8/11/12/25/28/29 H. K. Porter & Co. 7501/4/7/12 (1942) 7514/7/8/21/2/5/6 (? 1943) 7539/42/43 (1943), 1938/40/44 Davenport Loco. Wks. 2503/5/9 (3/1943). 1959/68/91 Vulcan Iron Wks. 4432/41/44 (2/43, 3/43, 3/43). 4372, 6006 Davenport Loco. Wks. 2521 (4/43) & 2595 (1/44). All the Vulcan lot except 1280 were marked for the Southern Ry. Although all had their original U.S.A. numbers, all except eleven (1252, 1390/3/8, 1400/4/11/29, 1944/68, 4372) carried W.D. prefix. The dates were not shown on the Porter engines. (With regard to the numbering, two of this class when at Longmoor were given numbers in the W.D. series, 75215 (1954) and 75217 (1958) for a short time only). | SLS/194705 |
17/12/1960 | Mirfield MPD | From 17th Dec., six B16s have been allocated for freight duties, viz.' 61411-4/6/47;, during 1959, several were on loan to this shed while the 4 Mirfield B1s were in shops. | SLS/196102 |
11/11/1961 | Darlington Works (Scrap Yard) | Erecting Shop: D17, D249/51/79, D3317 D4079-81, D5102/49/68-73, 43141, 60859/64/91, 60952, 61020/4, 61129/92, 61218/89, 61382, 63405, 68025, 90067, 90333/44/63, 90445, 92194/5. Works Yard: D245/74, D2246, D3228, 12113, 46450/80, 60856, 60916/23/48, 61008, 61216/20/57, 63342/59, 63419/69, 65099, 65769, 65821/60, 67647, 67762, 68007/50, 69008, 78026, 80069, 90009, 90450, 92183. Stripping Shop: 61415/47. Outside Stripping Shop: 60939, 63435, 65691. Crossing: D272, D351 D3140, D4078, D5096, D5101/67, 60806. Scrap Yard: 61411-4/9/22/3/31/6/60, 65741, 67707/13/7/22/75/94, 68675/92, 68702 intact. | SLS/196201 |
14/01/1962 | Darlington Works (Scrap Road) | Erecting Shop: D11, D256/71, D3316, D4083-8, D5107/8/49/72-5, 12119/20, 43053/7, 60812/98, 61275, 61388, 61454, 63381, 63467, 65768/72, 67638, 69005, 78026, 80118, 90397, 90620. Stripping Shop: 43071, 65892, 80117. Outside Stripping Shop: 60835, 61161, 92202. Works Yard: D18, D5096, 43055, 46450, 60809/22, 60963, 64897, 65099, 65862/9, 67681, 67718, 68017/43, 92064, 92199. Crossing: D17, D270/3, D2173, D2247/65, D3140, D4082, D5113. Scrap Road: 61411-3/5/9/36/43/50-2/9/60, 64979, 65741/69, 67707/13/22/39/50/72/5, 68688/9, 68729 all intact. | SLS/196203 |
11/02/1962 | Darlington Works (Scrap Road) | Erecting Shop: D14/7/8/24/6, D3071/4, D4087-92, D5108/48/73-5, 12120, 60807/35/7, 60931, 61035, 61274, 63438/64/70/2, 65892, 67742, 80117, 90310, 90677/95, 92202, Weigh House: Nil. Outside Weigh House: 82027, Stripping Shop: 46407, 65751, 80116. Outside Stripping Shop: 46460, 61039, 61383, 67753, 68064, 68672. Works Yard: D281, D2173, D2589, 43016/53/5/71, 60954/9/77/81, 63412, 65099, 65794, 65889, 67609, 68010/43, 80119. 90603. Crossing: D257/78/80, D2247, D4086, D5107/49. Scrap Road: 61201, 61368, 61411-3/5/9/36/43/50/1/60, 64979, 65741/69, 65839, 67707/22/7/39/50/75, 68063, 68674/80/88/9/98, 68703/29/34. | SLS/196204 |
25/03/1962 | Darlington Works (Scrap Yard) | Erecting Shop: D4094 (Complete), D4158-60 (Engines in), D4161-5 (Frames), D15/30, D248/56, D2265, D3071, D3138, D3943, 46450, 60882/5, 60901/57, 61240/88, 63399, 63420/48/63/71, 65099, 90351, 92144/98, 92201. Stripping Shop: 46476, 60804, 65763. Stripping Shop Yard: 43117, 61013, 61256, 63360, 63443, 67752, 90068/81. Works Yard: D2113, D4091/2, D5174, 43129, 46460/7, 60816/55. 60954, 67609/61, 68024/35/64, 90333, 92097, 92194, Crossing: D2164, D2230, D2589, D3229/43. Test House: D4093, D5175. Scrap Yard: 61411/2/3/5/9/22/43/50/1/60, 64979, 65741/51/69, 67707/39/50/3/75, 68063, 68680/8/9, 68703/29/34 all complete with 60960/77, 61368, 67665/81 partially cut up. | SLS/196205 |
14/07/1962 | Darlington Works (Scrap Yard) | Erecting Shop: D15, D238, D347, D2232/42, D2701, D3075, D3237, D5112, D4190-2 undercoats, D4193-5 motors fitted to body shells, 43054, 60876, 60955/7, 61018, 63343, 63409/10/26, 68037, 90322, 90622/51, 92061/2. Stripping Shop: 65786, 90008, 90132. Outside Stripping Shop: 63423, 65757. Crossing: D24, D244/6/83, D2604. Diesel Shunter Test House: D4189 painted. Sidings: 60953/62/81, 61010, 63368, 63456, 65099, 65720, 65807, 67634, 67788, 68014, 69026, 90113, 92034. Scrap Yard: 61077 being cut up, 61063, 61265/98, 61415/9/43/50/1, 65693, 65751, 67666, 67753/95 partially dismantled, 61411-3/60, 65695, 65741, 67601/23/60, 67707/47/50/75, 68052, 68707, 69017/97 intact. | SLS/196209 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1920 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 909 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Tweedmouth (TWD) Diagram 49 boiler fitted |
||
21/03/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 21/03/1923. Dep: 28/05/1923. | ||
15/09/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 15/09/1925. Dep: 27/11/1925. Work undertaken: Shorter chimney fitted |
||
14/02/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 14/02/1927. Dep: 01/06/1927. | ||
04/08/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/08/1927. Dep: 10/08/1927. | ||
09/04/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 09/04/1929. Dep: 21/06/1929. | ||
30/08/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
18/03/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/03/1932. Dep: 03/05/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1582 (Diagram 49) |
||
06/06/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1934. Dep: 20/07/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1559 (Diagram 49) |
||
07/04/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/04/1937. Dep: 10/05/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1184 (Diagram 49) |
||
11/05/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/05/1937. Dep: 14/05/1937. | ||
17/04/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/04/1940. Dep: 11/05/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1141 (Diagram 49) |
||
17/02/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/02/1943. Dep: 31/03/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3165 (Diagram 49A) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
12/10/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/10/1944. Dep: 02/11/1944. | ||
08/05/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/05/1946. Dep: 01/06/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3276 (Diagram 49A) |
||
16/06/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1412 | ||
20/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/01/1947. Dep: 15/02/1947. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
03/03/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/03/1948. Dep: 25/03/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR (Interim) number E1412 |
||
07/08/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
13/08/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
11/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1950. Dep: 10/06/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24086 (Diagram 49A) Renumbered to BR 61412 |
||
10/07/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/07/1950. Dep: 22/08/1950. | ||
11/09/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 11/09/1953. Dep: 10/10/1953. | ||
27/11/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/11/1954. Dep: 29/12/1954. | ||
13/04/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/04/1956. Dep: 23/05/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24104 (Diagram 49A) |
||
30/05/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/05/1956. Dep: 01/06/1956. | ||
01/10/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/10/1956. Dep: 19/10/1956. | ||
24/11/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/11/1959. Dep: 02/02/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24031 (Diagram 49A) |
||
11/12/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mirfield (56D) | ||
25/09/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61412 from Mirfield (56D) | ||
11/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |