Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 148 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 6537 Week
» 26979 Month
» 363825 Year
» 1585390 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 914 m/e 09/1920
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1414   10/11/1946
British Railways 61414   08/10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer V. Raven
Class B16
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 09/1920 to Heaton (HTN)
Withdrawal Mon 25/09/1961 off Mirfield (56D)
Scrapping During 11/1961 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)
Service Life 41 yrs , 25 dys

Notes
Notes Into Darlington for cutting up 7/11/61

Allocations
Code Name From Date
HTN Heaton (New) m/e 09/1920
NEV Neville Hill on 31/10/1929
YK York (North) on 28/03/1943
NEV Neville Hill on 07/08/1949
52B Heaton on 25/09/1955
52C Blaydon on 13/05/1956
50B Neville Hill on 10/06/1956
56D Mirfield on 11/12/1960
   Withdrawn on 25/09/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC NEV Neville Hill w/e 13/08/1949
ALLOC 52B Heaton 4w/e 08/10/1955
ALLOC 52C Blaydon 4w/e 26/05/1956
ALLOC 56D Mirfield on 17/12/1960
WDN   on 25/09/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1920 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1120)
11/12/1933 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2556)
05/08/1936 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1465)
04/07/1939 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3029)
09/10/1948 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3271)
08/03/1952 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 24048)
28/05/1955 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24024)
16/10/1958 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24046)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gateshead Works 10/01/1924 06/03/1924 57 days General  
Gateshead Works 02/05/1927 20/10/1927 172 days General  
Gateshead Works 24/04/1929 04/07/1929 72 days General  
Darlington Works 11/03/1932 11/04/1932 32 days Heavy  
Darlington Works 06/11/1933 11/12/1933 36 days General
Boiler number 2556 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 17/07/1936 05/08/1936 20 days General
Boiler number D1465 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 09/12/1937 02/05/1938 145 days Heavy  
Darlington Works 23/05/1939 04/07/1939 43 days General
Boiler number 3029 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 16/10/1941 28/11/1941 44 days General  
Darlington Works 07/04/1944 11/05/1944 35 days Light Repair
After collision
 
Darlington Works 07/12/1944 13/01/1945 38 days General
Boiler number 24039 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 17/09/1948 09/10/1948 23 days General
Boiler number 3271 (Diagram 49A)
Renumbered to BR 61414
 
Darlington Works 17/08/1949 10/09/1949 25 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 16/03/1951 20/03/1951 5 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 12/02/1952 08/03/1952 26 days General
Boiler number 24048 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 24/05/1954 30/06/1954 38 days Heavy Casual  
Darlington Works 31/08/1954 04/09/1954 5 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 03/05/1955 28/05/1955 26 days General
Boiler number 24024 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 31/05/1955 01/06/1955 2 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 11/09/1958 16/10/1958 36 days General
Boiler number 24046 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 21/10/1958 27/10/1958 7 days Unclassified  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
08/10/1955 North Eastern Miscellany Class B16 engines have now appeared at sheds in the Newcastle-upon-Tyne area and the following have been noted working between Heaton and Berwick on various classes of trains: 61410/13/14/15/40/67/69. Class K2 2-6-0 locos noted en route between Newcastle and Cowlairs recently for overhaul and repainting have been Nos. 61720/27/62/65. Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73101 worked a Newcastle-Berwick passenger train on the 21st Sept. en route for the Scottish Region. Class J21 0-6-0 Nos. 65117 an 65070 were hauled dead by a Class J39 for the north on 4/10 and a class Dll 4-4-0 62684 hauled Class K1 62031 dead from Haymarket shed to Gateshead on October 5th. During mid-October, Class D49 4-4-0 Nos. 62752 an 62720 have been observed working a morning Sunderland-Newcastle slow passenger train as a running-in turn, both engines being recently ex-works. SLS/195512
17/12/1960 Mirfield MPD From 17th Dec., six B16s have been allocated for freight duties, viz.' 61411-4/6/47;, during 1959, several were on loan to this shed while the 4 Mirfield B1s were in shops. SLS/196102

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1920 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 914
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Heaton (HTN)
Diagram 49 boiler fitted
   
10/01/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 10/01/1924. Dep: 06/03/1924.    
02/05/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 02/05/1927. Dep: 20/10/1927.    
24/04/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 24/04/1929. Dep: 04/07/1929.    
31/10/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV)    
11/03/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 11/03/1932. Dep: 11/04/1932.    
06/11/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/11/1933. Dep: 11/12/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2556 (Diagram 49)
   
17/07/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/07/1936. Dep: 05/08/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1465 (Diagram 49)
   
09/12/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 09/12/1937. Dep: 02/05/1938.    
23/05/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/05/1939. Dep: 04/07/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3029 (Diagram 49A)
   
16/10/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/10/1941. Dep: 28/11/1941.    
28/03/1943 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
07/04/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/04/1944. Dep: 11/05/1944.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
07/12/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/12/1944. Dep: 13/01/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24039 (Diagram 49A)
   
10/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1414    
17/09/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/09/1948. Dep: 09/10/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3271 (Diagram 49A)
Renumbered to BR 61414
   
07/08/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV)    
17/08/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/08/1949. Dep: 10/09/1949.    
16/03/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/03/1951. Dep: 20/03/1951.    
12/02/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/02/1952. Dep: 08/03/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24048 (Diagram 49)
   
24/05/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 24/05/1954. Dep: 30/06/1954.    
31/08/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/08/1954. Dep: 04/09/1954.    
03/05/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1955. Dep: 28/05/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24024 (Diagram 49A)
   
31/05/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/05/1955. Dep: 01/06/1955.    
25/09/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (52B)    
13/05/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Blaydon (52C)    
10/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B)    
11/09/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/09/1958. Dep: 16/10/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24046 (Diagram 49A)
   
21/10/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/10/1958. Dep: 27/10/1958.    
11/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Mirfield (56D)    
25/09/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 61414 from Mirfield (56D)    

prev prev